Park Bank v. Integral 2545 Stowell, LLC et al
Appellant: Park Bank
Appellee: Integral 2545 Stowell, LLC and Office of the US Trustee
Case Number: 2:2019cv00709
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Lynn Adelman
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Filing 7 DOCKETED IN ERROR BRIEFING LETTER Electronically Transmitted to Parties(jcl) Modified on 6/25/2019 (jcl).
June 11, 2019 Filing 6 RECORD ON APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 19-20553. (Attachments: #1 Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet)(ljr)
May 24, 2019 NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re #5 Affidavit ; Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 5, a separate certificate of service is not required for papers served electronically if all parties were served through the Courts Electronic Case Filing (ECF) system;the Local Rules can be found on our web site; Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (jcl)
May 24, 2019 Filing 5 Amended AFFIDAVIT of Mailing. (Goodman, Jonathan)
May 24, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Mailing. (Goodman, Jonathan)
May 24, 2019 Filing 3 OBJECTIONS by Integral 2545 Stowell, LLC . (Goodman, Jonathan)
May 13, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge Lynn Adelman (jcl)
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appeal (kan)
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY APPEAL (Short Record) from Bankruptcy Court case number 19-20553; (Attachments: #1 Bankruptcy Docket Sheet)(kan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Park Bank v. Integral 2545 Stowell, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Park Bank
Represented By: L Katie Mason
Represented By: Joseph E Fenzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Integral 2545 Stowell, LLC
Represented By: Jonathan V Goodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Office of the US Trustee
Represented By: Laura D Steele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?