Yates v. Aurora Health Care Inc

Plaintiff: Samuel Yates
Defendant: Aurora Health Care, Inc and Aurora Health Care Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv00711
Filed: May 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Nancy Joseph
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:451
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Case Terminated pursuant to #9 Stipulation of Dismissal (asc)
June 27, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION of Dismissal Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal under Rule 41 by Samuel Yates. (Hudock, Luke)
June 12, 2019 NOTICE from the clerk to DEFENDANT requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph be filed within 21 days; the form is available at the court's web site: www.wied.uscourts.gov (asc)
June 11, 2019 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE Statement by Aurora Health Care Inc. (Arnold, Julia)
June 11, 2019 Filing 7 BRIEF in Support filed by Aurora Health Care Inc re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Charge of Discrimination dated 10/12/18, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Right to Sue dated 10/17/18, #3 Exhibit C - Charge of Discrimination dated 12/18/18, #4 Exhibit D - EEOC Notice of Duplicate Charge)(Arnold, Julia)
June 11, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Aurora Health Care Inc. (Arnold, Julia)
June 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Julia S Arnold on behalf of Aurora Health Care Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Julia Arnold (Arnold, Julia)
June 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura A Lindner on behalf of Aurora Health Care Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Laura Lindner (Lindner, Laura)
June 7, 2019 SECOND NOTICE from the clerk to PLAINTIFF requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph be filed no later than 6/21/2019; the form is available at the court's web site: www.wied.uscourts.gov (asc)
May 15, 2019 Summons Issued as to Aurora Health Care Inc. (asc)
May 14, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website (ds)
May 14, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Samuel Yates (Hudock, Luke)
May 14, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by Samuel Yates. (Hudock, Luke)
May 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against Aurora Health Care, Inc by Samuel Yates. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3109384) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Hudock, Luke)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yates v. Aurora Health Care Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Yates
Represented By: Luke P Hudock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurora Health Care, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurora Health Care Inc
Represented By: Julia S Arnold
Represented By: Laura A Lindner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?