Bleier v. AO Smith Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Henry Bleier
Defendant: Kevin Wheeler, Corey D Holzer, AO Smith Corporation, Ajita Rajendra and John Kita
Case Number: 2:2019cv00786
Filed: May 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Lynn Adelman
Referring Judge: Nancy Joseph
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2019 Filing 28 RESPONSE by City of Birmingham Retirement and Relief System to August 15, 2019 Minute Order and Notice of Related Case (Kaplan, David) Modified on 8/20/2019 (bx).
August 15, 2019 Filing 27 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lynn Adelman: Status Conference held on 8/15/19. The court raised the question whether it has jurisdiction of this case given that the named plaintiff voluntarily dismissed the complaint before resolution of Birmingham's motion for appointment as lead plaintiff. The parties will confer regarding how to address the court's question. (jad)
August 13, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by David Kaplan on behalf of City of Birmingham Retirement and Relief System. Attorney(s) appearing: David Kaplan (Kaplan, David)
August 13, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon Marsh on behalf of City of Birmingham Retirement and Relief System. Attorney(s) appearing: Brandon Marsh (Marsh, Brandon)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 8/9/19 that a telephonic conference will be held on 8/15/19 at 1:30 p.m. The court will initiate the call. Counsel must email the court prior to the call at AdelmanPO@wied.uscourts.gov to provide contact information. (cc: all counsel)(jad)
August 8, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE by City of Birmingham Retirement and Relief System Non-Opposition to Motion for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff & Approval of Selection of Counsel (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Flanner, Mary)
August 2, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Henry Bleier. (Wagner, K)
August 1, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathryn K George on behalf of AO Smith Corporation, John Kita, Ajita Rajendra, Kevin Wheeler. Attorney(s) appearing: Kathryn George (George, Kathryn)
August 1, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas J Siciliano on behalf of AO Smith Corporation, John Kita, Ajita Rajendra, Kevin Wheeler. Attorney(s) appearing: Nicholas Siciliano (Siciliano, Nicholas)
August 1, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean M Berkowitz on behalf of AO Smith Corporation, John Kita, Ajita Rajendra, Kevin Wheeler. Attorney(s) appearing: Sean Berkowitz (Berkowitz, Sean)
July 29, 2019 Filing 18 DECLARATION of Steven B. Singer in support of Birmingham's Motion for appointment as Lead Plaintiff & approval of selection of counsel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Notice of Pendency of Class Action Business Wire Article, #2 Exhibit B Certification of Birmingham, #3 Exhibit C Chart of Estimated Loss, #4 Exhibit D Firm Bio Saxena White P.A., #5 Exhibit E Firm Bio Cross Law Firm)(Flanner, Mary)
July 29, 2019 Filing 17 BRIEF in Support filed by City of Birmingham Retirement and Relief System re #16 MOTION to Appoint City of Birmingham Ret & Relief System as Lead Plaintiff & Approving Selection of Counsel . (Flanner, Mary)
July 29, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Appoint City of Birmingham Ret & Relief System as Lead Plaintiff & Approving Selection of Counsel by City of Birmingham Retirement and Relief System. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Appointing Birmingham as Lead Plaintiff and Approving Selection of Counsel)(Flanner, Mary)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 6/20/19 granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. (cc: all counsel) (jad)
June 19, 2019 Filing 15 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Stiplulated Motion Extending Time to Respond to Complaint by All Defendants. (House, Bryan)
June 18, 2019 Filing 14 AMENDED DOCUMENT by All Defendants. Amended Notice of Appearance of Andrew J. Wronski (Wronski, Andrew)
June 18, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan B House on behalf of AO Smith Corporation, John Kita, Ajita Rajendra, Kevin Wheeler. Attorney(s) appearing: Bryan B. House (House, Bryan)
June 18, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew J Wronski on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney(s) appearing: Andrew J. Wronski (Wronski, Andrew)
June 17, 2019 Filing 11 DISCLOSURE Statement by AO Smith Corporation. (Imfeld, Nathan)
June 17, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan D Imfeld on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney(s) appearing: Nathan D. Imfeld (Imfeld, Nathan)
June 10, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Henry Bleier of Kevin Wheeler (Wagner, K)
June 10, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Henry Bleier of Ajita Rajendra (Wagner, K)
June 10, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Henry Bleier of John Kita (Wagner, K)
June 10, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Henry Bleier of A.O. Smith (Wagner, K)
June 10, 2019 Case reassigned to Judge Lynn Adelman. Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph no longer assigned to the case. (blr)
June 7, 2019 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Henry Bleier. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Manion, Shauna)
June 6, 2019 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE Statement by Henry Bleier. (Wagner, K)
June 6, 2019 SECOND NOTICE - Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement should have been filed with your first pleading. Please file your disclosure statement within 7 days. (blr)
May 30, 2019 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (blr)
May 30, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Henry Bleier (Attachments: #1 Summons A.O. Smith Corporation, #2 Summons Ajita Rajendra, #3 Summons John Kita, #4 Summons Kevin Wheeler)(Wagner, K)
May 29, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Henry Bleier (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons A.O. Smith, #2 Summons Summons Ajita Rajendra, #3 Summons Summons John Kita, #4 Summons Summons Kevin Wheeler)(Wagner, K)
May 28, 2019 NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re #1 Complaint, filed by Henry Bleier ; Electronically filed documents should not be scanned whenever possible. This document does not need to be re-filed; Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (blr)
May 28, 2019 Case Opening Modification(s); The following modification(s) have been made to your case entry: The county code has been modified - please remember to choose the county for the first named plaintiff. The attached summons was not prepared using the version found on our website as it does not contain the current Clerk of Court's name. Please follow the instructions and resubmit the summons using the event Request for Issuance of Summons which is found under the heading other documents. Please refer to the # attorney case opening instructions and the # summons instructions for further guidance. (blr)
May 28, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (ds)
May 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Violation of Federal Securities Law with Jury Demand; against AO Smith Corporation, John Kita, Ajita Rajendra, Kevin Wheeler by Henry Bleier. (Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3120303) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons AO Smith Corporation, #3 Summons Ajita Rajendra, #4 Summons John Kita, #5 Summons Kevin Wheeler, #6 Certification of Bleier pursuant to Federal Securities Laws)(Wagner, K)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bleier v. AO Smith Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Wheeler
Represented By: Andrew J Wronski
Represented By: Bryan B House
Represented By: Nathan D Imfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corey D Holzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AO Smith Corporation
Represented By: Andrew J Wronski
Represented By: Bryan B House
Represented By: Nathan D Imfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ajita Rajendra
Represented By: Andrew J Wronski
Represented By: Bryan B House
Represented By: Nathan D Imfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Kita
Represented By: Andrew J Wronski
Represented By: Bryan B House
Represented By: Nathan D Imfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Bleier
Represented By: K Scott Wagner
Represented By: Brian E Cochran
Represented By: Shauna D Manion
Represented By: Samuel H Rudman
Represented By: Corey D Holzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?