Arnold Simpson v. Brennan
Plaintiff: Henrietta E Arnold Simpson
Defendant: Postmaster General Megan Brennan
Case Number: 2:2019cv00789
Filed: May 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William E Duffin
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2019 Filing 6 Return of Service of Complaint by Certified Mail for Megan J. Brennan, Postmaster General on 6/10/2019 and US Attorney General on 6/11/2019.(mlm)
June 7, 2019 Filing 5 Return of Service of Complaint by Certified Mail by Megan Brennan served upon United States Attorney on 6/5/2019 (mlm)
June 4, 2019 Summons Issued and sent via certified mail to Megan Brennan, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (mlm)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 6/4/2019, granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee. (cc: all counsel, plaintiff) (mlm)
May 28, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Henrietta E Arnold Simpson. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (ds)
May 28, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Henrietta E Arnold Simpson. (ds)
May 28, 2019 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT against Megan Brennan filed by Henrietta E Arnold Simpson. Consent forms distributed for Magistrate Judge William E. Duffin. (ds) #1 Exhibits) (ds).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arnold Simpson v. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Postmaster General Megan Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henrietta E Arnold Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?