United States of America v. Shorewood Family Medical Clinic SC
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Shorewood Family Medical Clinic, SC and Shorewood Family Medical Clinic SC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00834
Filed: June 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Pamela Pepper
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by United States of America. (Yun, Lisa)
June 26, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Shorewood Family Medical Clinic SC. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(vkb)
June 26, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Shorewood Family Medical Clinic SC - Waiver sent on 6/4/2019 (vkb)
June 5, 2019 Filing 2 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by United States of America. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Yun, Lisa)
June 4, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge Pamela Pepper ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website (jcl)
June 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Shorewood Family Medical Clinic, SC by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A to H, #3 Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons, #4 Certificate of Service)(Yun, Lisa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Shorewood Family Medical Clinic SC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shorewood Family Medical Clinic, SC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shorewood Family Medical Clinic SC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Lisa Yun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?