Gilali v. Barr et al

Petitioner: Yousef A Gilali and Yousef A Galali
Respondent: Kirstjen Nelsen, Ronald Vitiello, Attorney General William Barr, Anthony Brugger and Dale Schmidt
Case Number: 2:2019cv00837
Filed: June 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Nancy Joseph
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2019 TRANSMIT Copies of #1 Petition and #8 Rule 4 Order to US Department of Homeland Security, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement, US Department of Justice, US Attorneys Office, Eastern District of Wisconsin. (asc)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RULE 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph. IT IS ORDERED that Gilali's motion to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee (Docket #4 ) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall effect service of the petition and this Order upon respondent pursuant to Rule 4 of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases. See order for briefing schedule. (cc: all counsel, petitioner) (asc)
July 22, 2019 Filing 7 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Yousef A Gilali. (asc)
July 22, 2019 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Yousef A Gilali. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (asc)
July 10, 2019 Filing 5 LETTER from the clerk re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. Also requesting that a six-month certified prisoner trust account statement be filed within 21 days. (asc)
July 8, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Yousef A Gilali. (asc)
June 19, 2019 Filing 3 Mail Sent to Petitioner Returned as undeliverable re #2 Letter from Clerk re Consent to Magistrate. Per Dodge County Detention Facility the petitioner was turned over to immigration in IL on 5/21/19. (ds)
June 5, 2019 Filing 2 LETTER from the clerk to Petitioner re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. Also requesting payment of the full filing fee or that a petition to proceed without prepayment of the full filing fee and six-month certified trust account statement be filed within 21 days. (ds)
June 5, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Yousef A Gilali. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(ds)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gilali v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Yousef A Gilali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Yousef A Galali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kirstjen Nelsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ronald Vitiello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General William Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Anthony Brugger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Dale Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?