Uline, Inc. v. Baran et al

Plaintiff: Uline Inc
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, L Francis Cissna, Director Kathy A Baran and Kirstjen Nielsen
Case Number: 2:2019cv00844
Filed: June 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Pamela Pepper
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2019 NOTICE from the clerk to All Parties requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge David E. Jones be filed within 21 days; the form is available at the court's web site: www.wied.uscourts.gov. District Judge assigned to this matter is the Honorable Pamela Pepper. (ds)
June 6, 2019 Filing 14 Case transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:19-cv-01305. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
June 5, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated. (ph, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 6/6/2019.]
June 5, 2019 Filing 13 TRANSFERRED to the Eastern District of Wisconsin, Milwaukee the electronic record. (ph, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 6/6/2019.]
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER signed by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 6/4/2019. Government's Motion to transfer the case #9 is granted and the case is transferred to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin. The Clerk ofCourt is directed to transfer the case to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin forthwith. Mailed notice(lk, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 6/6/2019.]
May 14, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE by Uline, Inc. to MOTION by Defendants Kathy A Baran, L. Francis Cissna, Kirstjen Nielsen, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security to transfer case And Extend Time To Respond To Complaint #9 (Kempster, Alec) [Transferred from ilnd on 6/6/2019.]
April 30, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Initial Status hearing held on 4/30/2019. Briefing schedule set as to Defendants' Motion to transfer case #9 . Response due by 5/14/2019. Reply due by 5/21/2019. Administrative record shall be filed by 7/10/2019. Cross Motions for Summary Judgment due by 7/31/2019. Response due by 8/28/2019. Reply due by 9/11/2019. Mailed notice (lk, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 6/6/2019.]
April 29, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION by Defendants Kathy A Baran, L. Francis Cissna, Kirstjen Nielsen, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security to transfer case And Extend Time To Respond To Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Press, Joshua) [Transferred from ilnd on 6/6/2019.]
April 24, 2019 Filing 8 STATUS Report by Kathy A Baran, L. Francis Cissna, Kirstjen Nielsen, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security (Press, Joshua) [Transferred from ilnd on 6/6/2019.]
April 23, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Kathy A Baran, L. Francis Cissna, Kirstjen Nielsen, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security by Joshua Samuel Press (Press, Joshua) [Transferred from ilnd on 6/6/2019.]
March 7, 2019 Filing 6 DESIGNATION of Craig Arthur Oswald as U.S. Attorney for Defendants Kathy A Baran, L. Francis Cissna, Kirstjen Nielsen, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security (Oswald, Craig) [Transferred from ilnd on 6/6/2019.]
March 1, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Initial status hearing set for 4/30/019 at 9:00 a.m. Joint Status Report due by 4/24/2019. The parties are directed to Judge Kendall's web page found at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov for information about the Initial Status Report and for information regarding all standing orders for cases on Judge Kendall's docket. The parties shall follow all of the standing orders for Judge Kendall and all Local Rules which can be found at the same web page. For the Initial Status Report, the parties are to report on the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) if no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary (with specific dates) to get the case ready for trial; 3) whether the parties jointly consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. At the Initial Status Hearing, the Parties shall be prepared to inform the Court about the extent of monetary damages in order for the Court to address the proportionality of discovery as required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26. Lead counsel is directed to appear at this status hearing. Mailed notice (lk, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 6/6/2019.]
February 22, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Kathy A Baran, L. Francis Cissna, Kirstjen Nielsen, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security and the U.S. Attorney's Office. (jjr, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 6/6/2019.]
February 22, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (ph, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 6/6/2019.]
February 21, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ec, ) [Transferred from ilnd on 6/6/2019.]
February 21, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Uline, Inc. by Alec Martin Kempster, 2nd (Kempster, Alec) [Transferred from ilnd on 6/6/2019.]
February 21, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Kempster, Alec) [Transferred from ilnd on 6/6/2019.]
February 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Uline, Inc.; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15511965. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3)(Kempster, Alec) [Transferred from ilnd on 6/6/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Uline, Inc. v. Baran et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Joshua Samuel Press
Represented By: Craig A Oswald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Joshua Samuel Press
Represented By: Craig A Oswald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L Francis Cissna
Represented By: Joshua Samuel Press
Represented By: Craig A Oswald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director Kathy A Baran
Represented By: Joshua Samuel Press
Represented By: Craig A Oswald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirstjen Nielsen
Represented By: Joshua Samuel Press
Represented By: Craig A Oswald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Uline Inc
Represented By: Alec Martin Kempster, 2nd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?