Symbology Innovations LLC v. Hayat Pharmacy 3 LLC et al
Plaintiff: Symbology Innovations, LLC and Symbology Innovations LLC
Defendant: Zaibak PRN, LLC, Hayat Pharmacy 3, LLC, Zaibak PRN LLC and Hayat Pharmacy 3 LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00854
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Nancy Joseph
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph. IT IS ORDERED: Initial Disclosures to be exchanged by 9/20/2019, Amended Pleadings due by 1/31/2020, Plaintiff's Expert Witness List due by 4/3/2020, Defendants' Expert Witness List due by 4/6/2020, Fact Discovery due by 7/31/2020, Expert Discovery due by 9/25/2020, Dispositive Motions due by 10/2/2020, ADR to be completed by 12/4/2020. Final/Joint Pretrial Report due by 1/11/2021. Any responses to pretrial submissions shall be filed no later than 1/18/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/25/2021 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 253, 517 E Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI 53202 before Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph. Jury Trial (3 days) set for 2/8/2021 at 9:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph. (cc: all counsel)(blr)
August 5, 2019 Filing 14 Minute Entry for Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference held 8/5/2019 before Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph. The parties discuss the case and discovery. The Court adopts the parties' proposed deadlines. (Tape #2:02:43-2:18:29) (blr)
August 1, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 8/5/2019 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph. The parties shall call he Court's conference line at 877- 336-1839 and use access code 5188910# to join the call. (cc: all counsel)(blr)
July 31, 2019 NOTICE of Cancellation of Hearing: Due to a conflict with the Court's calendar, the Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 8/2/2019 at 9:30 AM has been cancelled. The Clerk's Office will contact the parties regarding rescheduling. (cc: all counsel) (blr)
July 31, 2019 Filing 13 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan by Symbology Innovations LLC. (McArthur, M)
July 29, 2019 Filing 12 AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 8/2/2019 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph. The parties shall call the Court's conference line at 877- 336-1839 and use access code 5188910# to join the call. The parties' Rule 26(f) report is now due by 7/31/2019. Please see the attached notice regarding Magistrate Judge Joseph's requirements for the Rule 26(f) report. (cc: all counsel)(blr)
July 26, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 8/2/2019 at 9:30 AM will now be before Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph. The parties shall call the court's conference line at 877- 336-1839 and use access code 5188910# to join the call (cc: all counsel)(asc)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE ON CONSENT signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 7/25/2019. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph for all further proceedings. Judge J P Stadtmueller no longer assigned to case. (cc: all counsel)(jm)
July 25, 2019 Filing 10 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by All Defendants. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Guerard, Jeffrey)
July 25, 2019 NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re #9 Consent/Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge filed by Hayat Pharmacy 3 LLC, Zaibak PRN LLC ; Document must contain the name of the assigned magistrate judge. This document must be RE-FILED; Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (asc)
July 25, 2019 Filing 9 DISREGARD; INCOMPLETE DOCUMENTMagistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by All Defendants. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Guerard, Jeffrey) Modified on 7/25/2019 (asc).
July 23, 2019 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Symbology Innovations LLC. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (McArthur, M)
July 10, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 8/2/2019 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 425, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI before Judge J P Stadtmueller. Joint Rule 26 Plan due by 7/30/2019. (cc: all counsel)(jm)
July 10, 2019 SECOND NOTICE from the clerk to PLAINTIFF requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph be filed no later than 7/24/2019; the form is available at the court's web site: www.wied.uscourts.gov (asc)
July 10, 2019 NOTICE from the clerk to DEFENDANTS requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph be filed within 21 days; the form is available at the court's web site: www.wied.uscourts.gov (asc)
July 9, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey J Guerard on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney(s) appearing: Jeffrey J Guerard Munjed A. Ahmad (Guerard, Jeffrey)
July 9, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by All Defendants.(Guerard, Jeffrey)
July 1, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Symbology Innovations LLC. Zaibak PRN LLC served on 6/19/2019. (McArthur, M)
July 1, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Symbology Innovations LLC. Hayat Pharmacy 3 LLC served on 6/19/2019. (McArthur, M)
June 10, 2019 Filing 2 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks (asc)
June 10, 2019 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (asc)
June 10, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge J P Stadtmueller ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (ds)
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against All Defendants by Symbology Innovations, LLC. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3131695) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit US Patent 8424752, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(McArthur, M.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Symbology Innovations LLC v. Hayat Pharmacy 3 LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zaibak PRN, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hayat Pharmacy 3, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zaibak PRN LLC
Represented By: Munjed A Ahmad
Represented By: Jeffrey J Guerard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hayat Pharmacy 3 LLC
Represented By: Munjed A Ahmad
Represented By: Jeffrey J Guerard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Symbology Innovations, LLC
Represented By: M. Grant McArthur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Symbology Innovations LLC
Represented By: M Grant McArthur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?