Collins v. Kemerling et al
Plaintiff: Maurice Collins
Defendant: Becky Kramer, Gavin, Tammy West, Wehrle, Karen Lee, Penny Skaite, Sheryl Kinyon, Michael Kemerling, Sandra McArdle, S Martin, Jolinda Waterman, Eileen Gavin, Sandra Martin, Penny Skaife and Erin Wehrle
Case Number: 2:2019cv00858
Filed: June 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Lynn Adelman
Referring Judge: William E Duffin
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 TRANSMIT Order,Complaint, Notice, Waiver and consent forms to US Marshal for service upon defendants (jcl)
August 1, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Laure C Rakvic-Farr on behalf of Michael Kemerling, Sheryl Kinyon, Becky Kramer, Karen Lee, S Martin, Jolinda Waterman, Wehrle, Tammy West. Attorney(s) appearing: Laure Rakvic-Farr (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Rakvic-Farr, Laure)
August 1, 2019 Filing 11 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE BY DOJ as to Michael Kemerling, Sheryl Kinyon, Becky Kramer, Karen Lee, S Martin, Jolinda Waterman, Wehrle, Tammy West (Remington, Jennifer)
August 1, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Renee Remington on behalf of Michael Kemerling, Sheryl Kinyon, Becky Kramer, Karen Lee, S Martin, Jolinda Waterman, Wehrle, Tammy West. Attorney(s) appearing: Jennifer R. Remington (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Remington, Jennifer)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge William E Duffin for Pretrial Case Management signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 7/23/19. (cc: all counsel, Maurice Collins via US Mail)(kwb)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 7/16/19 granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee. Copies of the plaintiff's complaint and this order are being electronically sent today to the WI Dept of Justice for service on the defendants Michael Kemerling, Jolinda Waterman, Penny Skaite, Karen Lee, Sheryl Kinyon, Tammy West, Sandra McArdle, Becky Kramer, Wehrle, S. Martin, and Dr. Gavin. (cc: all counsel, plaintiff, warden) (jad)
June 24, 2019 INITIAL PARTIAL FILING FEE Received: $1.29, receipt number MK4689-078413. ; the payment of all future filing fees will be maintained by the financial department. (ds)
June 19, 2019 Case Reassigned to Judge Lynn Adelman. Magistrate Judge William E Duffin no longer assigned to the case due to non-consent. (cc: via US Mail to Plaintiff) (lz)
June 19, 2019 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Maurice Collins. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (tlf)
June 14, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to use funds from Release Account to pay initial partial filing fee by Maurice Collins. (mac)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 6/10/2019 that on or before 7/1/2019 plaintiff Maurice Collins shall forward to the Clerk of Court the sum of $ 1.29 as an initial partial filing fee in this action. If Collins fails to make the initial partial payment or show cause for failing to do so, this case may be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. If he does not wish to proceed with this action to avoid incurring a "strike" under 28 USC 1915(g) or does not wish to pay the filing fee as set forth in this Order, Collins must notify the court by filing a letter with the Clerk of Court on or before 7/1/2019. (cc: all counsel - via US Mail to Plaintiff and Warden-WI Secure Program Facility)(lz)
June 10, 2019 Filing 4 LETTER from the clerk to Maurice Collins re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge William E Duffin and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. (mac)
June 10, 2019 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Maurice Collins. (mac)
June 10, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Maurice Collins. (mac)
June 10, 2019 Filing 1 PRISONER COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed against All Defendants by Maurice Collins. (mac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Collins v. Kemerling et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maurice Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Becky Kramer
Represented By: Jennifer Renee Remington
Represented By: Laure C Rakvic-Farr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gavin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tammy West
Represented By: Jennifer Renee Remington
Represented By: Laure C Rakvic-Farr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wehrle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Lee
Represented By: Jennifer Renee Remington
Represented By: Laure C Rakvic-Farr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Penny Skaite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheryl Kinyon
Represented By: Jennifer Renee Remington
Represented By: Laure C Rakvic-Farr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Kemerling
Represented By: Wisconsin Dept of Justice - 1983 Actions
Represented By: Jennifer Renee Remington
Represented By: Laure C Rakvic-Farr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra McArdle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jolinda Waterman
Represented By: Jennifer Renee Remington
Represented By: Laure C Rakvic-Farr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eileen Gavin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra Martin
Represented By: Jennifer Renee Remington
Represented By: Laure C Rakvic-Farr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Penny Skaife
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erin Wehrle
Represented By: Jennifer Renee Remington
Represented By: Laure C Rakvic-Farr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?