Cabagua v. Jess
Petitioner: Mark Daniel Cabagua
Respondent: Cathy A Jess
Case Number: 2:2019cv00881
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Pamela Pepper
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 FILING FEE Received: $5.00, receipt number MK4689-078509. (jcl)
June 26, 2019 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Mark Daniel Cabagua. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (mac)
June 18, 2019 Filing 7 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Mark Daniel Cabagua. (mac)
June 18, 2019 Filing 6 LETTER from the Clerk to Mark Daniel Cabagua regarding the Prisoner E-Filing Program. (cc: All Counsel) (Attachments: #1 Prisoner E-Filing Information Packet)(tlf)
June 14, 2019 Filing 5 LETTER from the clerk to Mark Cabagua re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge Duffin and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. Also requesting that a six-month certified prisoner trust account statement be filed within 21 days. (lh)
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Evidentiary Hearing by Mark Daniel Cabagua. (lh)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Mark Daniel Cabagua. (lh)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 BRIEF filed by Mark Daniel Cabagua re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (Attachments: #1 bookmarked exhibits A-U)(lh)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Mark Daniel Cabagua. (lh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cabagua v. Jess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Cathy A Jess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mark Daniel Cabagua
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?