H5G LLC v. RAM Group Inc
Plaintiff: H5G LLC
Defendant: RAM Group Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv00982
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Filing 19 REPLY BRIEF in Support filed by RAM Group Inc re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION for More Definite Statement . (Rigsby, Cynthia)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Judge J.P. Stadtmueller on 8/27/19. Interim Settlement Report due by 3/17/20; Dispositive Motions due by 3/20/20; Final Settlement Report due by 6/15/20; Motions in Limine and Daubert Motions due by 6/19/20; Final/Joint Pretrial Report due by 2:00 PM on 6/24/20. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/30/20 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 425, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI before Judge J.P. Stadtmueller. Jury Trial set for 7/6/20 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 425, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI before Judge J.P. Stadtmueller. See Order. (cc: all counsel)(cl)
August 22, 2019 Filing 17 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge J.P. Stadtmueller: Scheduling Conference held on 8/22/2019. (Court Reporter John Schindhelm) (cl)
August 22, 2019 NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re #15 Affidavit; The exhibits should have been filed as attachments to the affidavit. These documents do not need to be re-filed. Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (blr)
August 21, 2019 Filing 16 BRIEF in Opposition filed by H5G LLC re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION for More Definite Statement . (Murdock, Anthony)
August 21, 2019 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT of Anthony K. Murdock . (Murdock, Anthony)
August 19, 2019 Filing 14 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan by H5G LLC. (Galster, Garet)
August 4, 2019 Filing 13 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by RAM Group Inc. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Boehm, Kelsey)
August 2, 2019 NOTICE from the clerk to DEFENDANT requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge William E. Duffin be filed within 21 days; the form is available at the court's web site: www.wied.uscourts.gov (asc)
August 2, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea L Murdock on behalf of H5G LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: Andrea L. Murdock (Murdock, Andrea)
August 2, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony K Murdock on behalf of H5G LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: Anthony Murdock (Murdock, Anthony)
August 1, 2019 Filing 10 BRIEF in Support filed by RAM Group Inc re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION for More Definite Statement . (Attachments: #1 Copies of Unpublished Decisions)(Rigsby, Cynthia)
August 1, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION for More Definite Statement by RAM Group Inc. (Rigsby, Cynthia)
August 1, 2019 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE Statement by RAM Group Inc. (Rigsby, Cynthia)
July 31, 2019 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by H5G LLC. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Galster, Garet)
July 31, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 8/22/2019 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 425, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI before Judge J P Stadtmueller. Joint Rule 26 Plan due by 8/19/2019. (cc: all counsel)(jm)
July 31, 2019 NOTICE from the clerk to ALL PARTIES requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge William E. Duffin be filed within 21 days; the form is available at the court's web site: www.wied.uscourts.gov (asc)
July 31, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Cynthia J Rigsby on behalf of RAM Group Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Cynthia J. Rigsby (Rigsby, Cynthia)
July 31, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelsey C Boehm on behalf of RAM Group Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Kelsey C. Boehm (Boehm, Kelsey)
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 Report On TheFiling of Determination of anAction Regarding a Copyright mailed to the Register of Copyrights via USPS. (asc)
July 10, 2019 Summons Issued as to RAM Group Inc. (asc)
July 10, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge J P Stadtmueller ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website (jcl)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by H5G LLC. (Galster, Garet)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against RAM Group Inc by H5G LLC. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3157763) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Galster, Garet)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: H5G LLC v. RAM Group Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAM Group Inc
Represented By: Cynthia J Rigsby
Represented By: Kelsey C Boehm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H5G LLC
Represented By: Melissa A Spindler
Represented By: Garet K Galster
Represented By: Andrea L Murdock
Represented By: Anthony K Murdock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?