Rivers et al v. B Braun Medical Inc et al
Plaintiff: Jeannine Janet Rivers
Defendant: B. Braun Medical S.A.S., B. Braun Interventional Systems Inc., B. Braun Medical Inc., B Braun Medical SAS, B Braun Interventional Systems Inc and B Braun Medical Inc
Not Yet Classified: Department of Health and Human Services and Alex M Azar, II
Case Number: 2:2019cv00988
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2019 Filing 8 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by B Braun Interventional Systems Inc, B Braun Medical Inc. (Cohen, Lori)
August 19, 2019 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE Statement by B Braun Interventional Systems Inc. (Cohen, Lori)
August 19, 2019 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE Statement by B Braun Interventional Systems Inc, B Braun Medical Inc. (Cohen, Lori)
August 19, 2019 Filing 5 Defendants ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses by B Braun Interventional Systems Inc, B Braun Medical Inc.(Cohen, Lori)
August 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Lori G Cohen on behalf of B Braun Interventional Systems Inc, B Braun Medical Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Lori G. Cohen (Cohen, Lori)
August 1, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by All Plaintiffs. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Martin, Kevin)
July 12, 2019 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (blr)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by Jeannine Janet Rivers. (Martin, Kevin)
July 11, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge J P Stadtmueller ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against All Defendants Jeannine Janet Rivers by Jeannine Janet Rivers. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3159178) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Martin, Kevin) Modified on 7/12/2019 (blr).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rivers et al v. B Braun Medical Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Department of Health and Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Alex M Azar, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Braun Medical S.A.S.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Braun Interventional Systems Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Braun Medical Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B Braun Medical SAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B Braun Interventional Systems Inc
Represented By: Lori G Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B Braun Medical Inc
Represented By: Lori G Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeannine Janet Rivers
Represented By: Kevin R Martin
Represented By: Laura Baughman
Represented By: Ben C Martin
Represented By: Thomas W Arbon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?