Paswaters v. Krones Inc
Plaintiff: Douglas Paswaters
Defendant: Krones, Inc. and Krones Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv00993
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Nancy Joseph
Referring Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Judge J.P. Stadtmueller on 8/30/19. Interim Settlement Report due by 3/2/20; Dispositive Motions due by 3/6/20; Final Settlement Report due by 6/15/20; Motions in Limine and Daubert Motions due by 6/19/20; Final/Joint Pretrial Report due by 2:00 PM on 6/24/20. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/30/20 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 425, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI before Judge J.P. Stadtmueller. Jury Trial set for 7/6/20 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 425, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI before Judge J.P. Stadtmueller. (cc: all counsel)(cl)
August 30, 2019 Filing 8 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge J.P. Stadtmueller: Scheduling Conference held on 8/30/2019. (Court Reporter Thomas Malkiewicz) (cl)
August 21, 2019 Filing 7 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan by Douglas Paswaters. (Luzi, Scott)
August 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 8/30/2019 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 425, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI before Judge J P Stadtmueller. Joint Rule 26 Plan due by 8/27/2019. (cc: all counsel)(jm)
August 9, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Krones Inc - Waiver sent on 7/12/2019. (Luzi, Scott)
July 15, 2019 Case reassigned to Judge J P Stadtmueller. Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph no longer assigned to the case. (blr)
July 15, 2019 Summons Issued as to Krones Inc. (blr)
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Douglas Paswaters. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Luzi, Scott)
July 12, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website. (ds)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott S Luzi on behalf of Douglas Paswaters. Attorney(s) appearing: Scott S. Luzi, James A. Walcheske (Luzi, Scott)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by Douglas Paswaters. (Luzi, Scott)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against Krones, Inc. by Douglas Paswaters. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3159527) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Paswaters Consent to Join Form)(Luzi, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Paswaters v. Krones Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Krones, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Krones Inc
Represented By: Robert W Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Paswaters
Represented By: Scott S Luzi
Represented By: James A Walcheske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?