Bradley v. John Doe et al
Plaintiff: Brandon Bradley, Sr
Defendant: Jane Doe, Lt John Doe, Deputy Balvin, John and Jane Does, Nurse Jane/John Doe, Deputy Walker, Sgt Jane/John Does, Deputy Coffey, Deputy Floyd, Deputy Gay, Jane/John Does and Deputy Van Norm
Case Number: 2:2019cv01014
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William E Duffin
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2019 Case Terminated Voluntarily pursuant to pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i). (cc: all counsel - via US Mail to Plaintiff) (lz)
July 24, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Brandon Bradley, Sr. (lz)
July 18, 2019 Filing 8 SUPPLEMENT by Brandon Bradley, Sr re #1 Complaint - Prisoner, #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee. (Attachments: #1 Supplement to Motion to IFP, #2 Text of Proposed Order for Prelim Injunction TRO)(lh)
July 18, 2019 Filing 7 DECLARATION of Brandon Bradley (lh)
July 18, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Brandon Bradley, Sr. (lh)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 7/17/2019 that on or before 8/7/2019 plaintiff shall forward to the Clerk of Court the sum of $ 2.10 as an initial partial filing fee in this action. If plaintiff does not wish to proceed with this action to avoid incurring a "strike" under 28 USC 1915(g) or does not wish to pay the filing fee as set forth in this Order, he must notify the court by filing a letter with the Clerk of Court on or before 8/7/2019. If plaintiff fails to make the initial partial payment or show cause for failing to do so, this case may be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. (cc: all counsel - via US Mail to Plaintiff and Warden-Dodge Corr Inst)(lz)
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 LETTER from the clerk to Brandon Bradley, Sr re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge Duffin and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. (lh)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Brandon Bradley, Sr. (lh)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Brandon Bradley, Sr. (lh)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 PRISONER COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed against All Defendants by Brandon Bradley, Sr. (lh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bradley v. John Doe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Balvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Jane/John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt Jane/John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Coffey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Floyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Gay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane/John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Van Norm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Bradley, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?