Massey v. State of Wisconsin et al
Plaintiff: Tronick D Massey
Defendant: State of Wisconsin and Kenosha County Transporation
Case Number: 2:2019cv01019
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Lynn Adelman
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 INITIAL PARTIAL FILING FEE Received: $50.00, receipt number MK4689-079025. ; the payment of all future filing fees will be maintained by the financial department. (ds)
July 24, 2019 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Tronick D Massey. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (jcl)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 07/22/2019. That on or before 21 days from the date of this order plaintiff shall forward to the Clerk of Court the sum of $6.00 as an initial partial filing fee in this action. (cc: all counsel,plaintiff,Warden, Financial)(lls)
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 LETTER from the clerk to plaintiff re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge Joseph and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. (jcl)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Tronick D Massey. (jcl)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Tronick D Massey. (jcl)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 PRISONER COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed against All Defendants by Tronick D Massey. (jcl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Massey v. State of Wisconsin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Wisconsin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenosha County Transporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tronick D Massey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?