Island Intellectual Property LLC v. American Deposit Management LLC
Plaintiff: Island Intellectual Property LLC
Defendant: American Deposit Management LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv01038
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Pamela Pepper
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 9/16/2019 re #11 Joint Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. The court APPROVES the parties' stipulation for an extension of time. The court ORDERS that the time for defendant American Deposit Management to file an answer or other responsive pleading to the complaint is EXTENDED until the end of the day on October 21, 2019; if the defendant files any motion, the plaintiff shall have 30 days to respond. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
September 13, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by Island Intellectual Property LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wilbert, Johanna)
September 10, 2019 Filing 10 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by American Deposit Management LLC. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Stockhausen, Paul)
August 26, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by John Dellaportas on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Attorney(s) appearing: John Dellaportas (Dellaportas, John)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 8/21/2019 re #7 Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. The court APPROVES the parties' stipulation for an extension of time. The court ORDERS that the time for the defendant to file an answer or other responsive pleading to the complaint is EXTENDED until the end of the day on September 19, 2019. Note: there is no document associated with this text only order. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
August 21, 2019 NOTICE from the clerk to all parties requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge William E. Duffin be filed within 21 days; the form is available at the court's web site: www.wied.uscourts.gov (amb)
August 20, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by Island Intellectual Property LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wilbert, Johanna)
August 20, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul J Stockhausen on behalf of American Deposit Management LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: Paul J. Stockhausen (Stockhausen, Paul)
August 12, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Island Intellectual Property LLC. American Deposit Management LLC served on 7/30/2019. (Wilbert, Johanna)
July 23, 2019 Summons Issued as to American Deposit Management LLC. (vkb)
July 22, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge Pamela Pepper ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website (jcl)
July 19, 2019 Filing 4 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks (Wilbert, Johanna)
July 19, 2019 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE Statement by Island Intellectual Property LLC. (Wilbert, Johanna)
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Johanna M Wilbert on behalf of Island Intellectual Property LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: Johanna M. Wilbert and Michael T. Piery (Wilbert, Johanna)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against American Deposit Management LLC by Island Intellectual Property LLC. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3166385) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - US7509286, #2 Exhibit B - US7668772, #3 Exhibit C - US8019667, #4 Exhibit D - US8260697, #5 Exhibit E - US8566201, #6 Summons, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wilbert, Johanna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Island Intellectual Property LLC v. American Deposit Management LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Deposit Management LLC
Represented By: Paul J Stockhausen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Island Intellectual Property LLC
Represented By: Johanna M Wilbert
Represented By: John Dellaportas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?