Peterson v DC Docks and Boatlifts Inc et al
Appellant: Daniel Scott Peterson
Appellee: Herbert J Cuene, Jr and DC Docks and Boatlifts Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv01051
Filed: July 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Pamela Pepper
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2019 Filing 6 Appellant's BRIEF filed by Daniel Scott Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Bookmarked Appendix)(lh)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 8/23/2019. Appellant Daniel Scott Peterson filed a motion for an extension of time to file his initial appeal brief in this case. Dkt. No. 4. It appears from the motion that the appellant understood his brief to be due 30 days from the filing of the notice of appeal, which was docketed on July 23, 2019, and he asked for a 21-day extension to September 13, 2019. However, under Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8018(a)(1), the appellant must serve and file his brief within 30 days after the docketing of notice that the record has been transmitted or is available electronically. In this case, the Clerk of Court docketed the record on appeal on August 21, 2019, so the appellant's brief is due September 20, 2019--a week after the requested extension date. The court DENIES as moot the appellant's motion for an extension of time. Note: there is no document associated with this text only order. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Daniel Scott Peterson)(cb)
August 21, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to file brief by Daniel Scott Peterson. (amb)
August 21, 2019 Filing 3 BRIEFING LETTER Electronically Transmitted to Parties. Sent via US Mail to Mr. Peterson. (amb)
August 21, 2019 Docket Annotation: partial appeal filing fee of $149 paid to the Bankruptcy Court. Balance due is $149. (kmm)
August 21, 2019 Filing 2 RECORD ON APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 18-2259. (Attachments: #1 Adversary Docket Sheet with Decision on plaintiffs motion for summary judgment and Order denying debtors discharge)(kan)
July 24, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge Pamela Pepper. (ds)
July 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY APPEAL (Short Record) from Bankruptcy Court case number 18-2259; (Attachments: #1 Adversary Docket Sheet with Order on Decision and Order Denying Discharge)(ljr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peterson v DC Docks and Boatlifts Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Daniel Scott Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Herbert J Cuene, Jr
Represented By: Curtis R Czachor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: DC Docks and Boatlifts Inc
Represented By: Curtis R Czachor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?