Dynamic Intl of Wisconsin Inc v. OKK USA Corporation
Plaintiff: Dynamic Intl of Wisconsin Inc
Defendant: OKK USA Corporation
Case Number: 2:2019cv01055
Filed: July 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Lynn Adelman
Referring Judge: Nancy Joseph
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Granting #23 Stipulation to Amend Scheduling Order signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 9/19/19. (cc: all counsel)(jad)
September 16, 2019 Filing 23 STIPULATION to Amend Scheduling Order by Dynamic Intl of Wisconsin Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goode, Joseph)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Regarding Confidentiality signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 9/13/19. (cc: all counsel)(jad)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 9/13/19 granting #21 Motion for Protective Order. (cc: all counsel) (jad)
September 11, 2019 NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re #21 Joint MOTION for Protective Order filed by Dynamic Intl of Wisconsin Inc ; Exhibit A should have been filed as an attachment. This document does not need to be re-filed; Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (jcl)
September 11, 2019 Filing 21 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Dynamic Intl of Wisconsin Inc. (Goode, Joseph)
September 4, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Klay Baynar on behalf of Dynamic Intl of Wisconsin Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Klay A. Baynar (Baynar, Klay)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 8/21/19. Written discovery served by 8/30/19. Discovery response due 9/20/19. Depositions due 10/21/19. Response to plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction due 12/3/19. Reply re motion for preliminary injunction due 12/18/19 (cc: all counsel)(jad)
August 20, 2019 Filing 18 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lynn Adelman: Status Conference held on 8/20/19. Court and parties discuss case and plaintiff's motion for a preliminary injunction. Parties agree to a schedule for limited early discovery and filing briefs on motion for preliminary injunction. Court will issue separate order with these dates. After the conclusion of discovery, the parties will inform the court if an evidentiary hearing is needed on the motion for preliminary injunction. Plaintiff makes clear that it is no longer seeking an ex parte temporary restraining order. (jad)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 8/15/19. IT IS ORDERED that a telephonic status conference will be held on 8/20/19 at 1:45 p.m. The court will initiate the call. Counsel must email the court prior to the call at AdelmanPO@wied.uscourts.gov to provide contact information. (cc: all counsel)(jad)
August 14, 2019 Case reassigned to Judge Lynn Adelman. Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph no longer assigned to the case. (asc)
August 14, 2019 Filing 16 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by OKK USA Corporation. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Stanis, John)
July 30, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Russell J Karnes on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney(s) appearing: Russell J. Karnes (Karnes, Russell)
July 30, 2019 Filing 14 LETTER from Mark Leitner on behalf of Plaintiff . (Leitner, Mark)
July 25, 2019 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Richard F. Layo in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for TRO & Injunction. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Copies of Customer Transmittals)(Goode, Joseph)
July 25, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and MOTION for Temporary Injunction by Dynamic Intl of Wisconsin Inc. (Goode, Joseph). Added MOTION for Order on 7/25/2019 (asc).
July 25, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by OKK USA Corporation - Waiver sent on 7/25/2019. (Leitner, Mark)
July 24, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by John W Halpin on behalf of Dynamic Intl of Wisconsin Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: John W. Halpin (Halpin, John)
July 24, 2019 Filing 9 LETTER from Plaintiff's Counsel to Clerk regarding previously filed Motion . (Leitner, Mark)
July 24, 2019 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Dynamic Intl of Wisconsin Inc. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Leitner, Mark)
July 24, 2019 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE Statement by Dynamic Intl of Wisconsin Inc. (Leitner, Mark)
July 24, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark M Leitner on behalf of Dynamic Intl of Wisconsin Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Mark M. Leitner (Leitner, Mark)
July 24, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph S Goode on behalf of Dynamic Intl of Wisconsin Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Joseph S. Goode (Goode, Joseph)
July 24, 2019 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE Statement by OKK USA Corporation. (Stanis, John)
July 24, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by David J Stein on behalf of OKK USA Corporation. Attorney(s) appearing: David J. Stein (Stein, David)
July 24, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by John B Stanis on behalf of OKK USA CORPORATION. Attorney(s) appearing: John B. Stanis (Stanis, John)
July 24, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)
July 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by OKK USA CORPORATION from Circuit Court Waukesha County, Case Number: 19-cv-1280 with attached state court documents. (Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3170506) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Group Exhibit A)(Stanis, John) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/24/2019: #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (jcl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dynamic Intl of Wisconsin Inc v. OKK USA Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OKK USA Corporation
Represented By: David J Stein
Represented By: John B Stanis
Represented By: Russell J Karnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dynamic Intl of Wisconsin Inc
Represented By: Mark M Leitner
Represented By: Joseph S Goode
Represented By: John W Halpin
Represented By: Klay Baynar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?