Tombs v. Fields et al
Plaintiff: Lorenzo D Tombs
Defendant: Jodi Fields, James Greer, Rowin-Fox, Gagnon, Lt K Johnson, Dr Bekx, Keith Johnson, Angelica Rowin-Fox and Monica Gagnon
Case Number: 2:2019cv01164
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
Referring Judge: David E Jones
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Laure C Rakvic-Farr on behalf of Jodi Fields, Gagnon, K Johnson, Rowin-Fox. Attorney(s) appearing: Laure Rakvic-Farr (Rakvic-Farr, Laure)
October 8, 2019 Filing 15 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE BY DOJ as to Jodi Fields, Gagnon, K Johnson, Rowin-Fox (Grzebielski, Kevin)
October 8, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin L Grzebielski on behalf of Jodi Fields, Gagnon, K Johnson, Rowin-Fox. Attorney(s) appearing: Kevin L. Grzebielski (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Grzebielski, Kevin)
October 7, 2019 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Jodi Fields, Gagnon, K Johnson, Rowin-Fox, Dr Bekx filed by Lorenzo D Tombs.(mac)
October 7, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Lorenzo D Tombs. (mac)
September 23, 2019 Due to the unavailability of Magistrate Judge David E. Jones, this case has been reassigned to Chief Judge William C Griesbach (Copy mailed to Pro Se Plaintiff). (kah)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCREENING ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge David E Jones on 9/20/19 granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee; denying without prejudice #10 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Defendant James Greer is DISMISSED. It is ORDERED that, under the informal service agreement, defendants Fields, Johnson, Gagnon, and Rowin-Fox shall file a responsive pleading to the complaint within 60 days. (cc: all counsel - via US Mail to Plaintiff and Warden, OCI) (kah)
September 18, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Lorenzo D Tombs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(cav)
September 4, 2019 Filing 9 ORIGINAL DOCUMENT submitted by Lorenzo D Tombs: Amended Complaint (page 1 only) seeking to add Dr Bekx as an additional defendant in this case. (tlf)
August 29, 2019 INITIAL PARTIAL FILING FEE Received: $3.85, receipt number GB4689-4689005508. ; the payment of all future filing fees will be maintained by the financial department (lh)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that on or before 09/11/2019 plaintiff shall forward to the Clerk of Court the sum of $ 3.85 as an initial partial filing fee in this action signed by Magistrate Judge David E Jones on 08/21/2019. (cc: all counsel, via US Mail to plaintiff and warden)(amb)
August 20, 2019 Filing 7 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Lorenzo D Tombs. (lh)
August 20, 2019 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Lorenzo D Tombs. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (lh)
August 19, 2019 Filing 5 LETTER from the Clerk to Lorenzo D Tombs regarding the Prisoner E-Filing Program. (cc: All Counsel) (Attachments: #1 Prisoner E-Filing Information Packet)(tlf)
August 13, 2019 Filing 4 LETTER from the clerk to Lorenzo Tombs re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge Jones and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. Also requesting that a six-month certified prisoner trust account statement be filed within 21 days. (lh)
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 Incomplete Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Lorenzo D Tombs. (lh)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Lorenzo D Tombs. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit IFP)(lh)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 PRISONER COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed against All Defendants by Lorenzo D Tombs. (lh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tombs v. Fields et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jodi Fields
Represented By: Wisconsin Dept of Justice - 1983 Actions
Represented By: Laure C Rakvic-Farr
Represented By: Kevin L Grzebielski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Greer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rowin-Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gagnon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt K Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr Bekx
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Johnson
Represented By: Laure C Rakvic-Farr
Represented By: Kevin L Grzebielski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angelica Rowin-Fox
Represented By: Laure C Rakvic-Farr
Represented By: Kevin L Grzebielski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monica Gagnon
Represented By: Laure C Rakvic-Farr
Represented By: Kevin L Grzebielski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorenzo D Tombs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?