Falk et al v. Wheeler et al
Plaintiff: SABR TAG, LLC d/b/a SABR XTREME LASER TAG f/k/a HARD KNOCKS MILWAUKEE, LLC, STEVEN FALK and Sabr Tag LLC
Defendant: Joseph N. Wheeler, Sr., INDOOR WAR LLC a/k/a INDOORWAR LLC, HARD KNOCKS LLC, Dena R. Wheeler, Joseph N. Wheeler, Jr., Dena R Wheeler, Indoor War LLC, Joseph N Wheeler, Sr, Dena Mousarra, Indoorwar LLC and Joseph N Wheeler, Jr
Case Number: 2:2019cv01168
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Lynn Adelman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 Filing 17 BRIEF in Opposition filed by Steven Falk, Sabr Tag LLC re #11 MOTION to Dismiss . (Goode, Joseph)
September 5, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Klay Baynar on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Attorney(s) appearing: Klay A. Baynar (Baynar, Klay)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Setting Briefing Deadlines re Defendants' Motion to Dismiss signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 9/5/19. (cc: all counsel)(jad)
September 4, 2019 Filing 14 STIPULATION to Amend Briefing Deadlines Related to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Steven Falk, Sabr Tag LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goode, Joseph)
September 4, 2019 Due to non-consent this case has been randomly reassigned to Judge Lynn Adelman. Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph no longer assigned to the case. (blr)
September 3, 2019 Filing 13 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by All Defendants. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Zimmer, Paul)
August 27, 2019 Filing 12 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Steven Falk, Sabr Tag LLC. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Goode, Joseph)
August 22, 2019 NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re #11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Joseph N Wheeler, Sr, Indoor War LLC, Hard Knocks LLC, Dena R Wheeler, Joseph N Wheeler, Jr; The brief in support should have been filed as a separate entry. This document does not need to be re-filed; Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (blr)
August 21, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss and BRIEF in Support by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Zimmer, Paul) Modified on 8/22/2019 (blr).
August 16, 2019 Case Opening Modification(s)to DEFENDANTS; The following modification(s) have been made to your case entry: One or more party names have been modified - please remember to follow the Party Name Guidelines found on our website. ; Please refer to the # attorney case opening instructions, and the # party name guidelines found in the user manual for further guidance (asc)
August 16, 2019 NOTICE from the clerk to PLAINTIFFS requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph be filed within 21 days; the form is available at the court's web site: www.wied.uscourts.gov (asc)
August 15, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs Affidavit of Service on Hard Knocks, LLC (Farley, Jessica)
August 15, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs Affidavit of Service on Indoor War LLC (Farley, Jessica)
August 15, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs Affidavit of Service on Joseph Wheeler Jr. (Farley, Jessica)
August 15, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs Affidavit of Service on Joseph Wheeler Sr. (Farley, Jessica)
August 15, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs Affidavit of Service on Dena Wheeler (Farley, Jessica)
August 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica L Farley on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Attorney(s) appearing: Jessica L. Farley (Farley, Jessica)
August 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph S Goode on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Attorney(s) appearing: Joseph S. Goode (Goode, Joseph)
August 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark M Leitner on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Attorney(s) appearing: Mark M. Leitner (Leitner, Mark)
August 15, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website (jcl)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by All Defendants. (Zimmer, Paul)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Joseph N. Wheeler, Sr. from Milwaukee County, Case Number: 19-cv-3165 with attached state court documents. (Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3188555) (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Joseph N. Wheeler, Sr.)(Zimmer, Paul) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/15/2019: #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (jcl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Falk et al v. Wheeler et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph N. Wheeler, Sr.
Represented By: Paul W Zimmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INDOOR WAR LLC a/k/a INDOORWAR LLC
Represented By: Paul W Zimmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HARD KNOCKS LLC
Represented By: Paul W Zimmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dena R. Wheeler
Represented By: Paul W Zimmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph N. Wheeler, Jr.
Represented By: Paul W Zimmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dena R Wheeler
Represented By: Paul W Zimmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indoor War LLC
Represented By: Paul W Zimmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph N Wheeler, Sr
Represented By: Paul W Zimmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dena Mousarra
Represented By: Paul W Zimmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indoorwar LLC
Represented By: Paul W Zimmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph N Wheeler, Jr
Represented By: Paul W Zimmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SABR TAG, LLC d/b/a SABR XTREME LASER TAG f/k/a HARD KNOCKS MILWAUKEE, LLC
Represented By: Mark M Leitner
Represented By: Joseph S Goode
Represented By: Jessica L Farley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEVEN FALK
Represented By: Mark M Leitner
Represented By: Joseph S Goode
Represented By: Jessica L Farley
Represented By: Klay Baynar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sabr Tag LLC
Represented By: Mark M Leitner
Represented By: Joseph S Goode
Represented By: Jessica L Farley
Represented By: Klay Baynar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?