Johnson v. Heuer Law Offices SC
Plaintiff: Lindsay A. Johnson and Lindsay A Johnson
Defendant: Heuer Law Offices, S.C. and Heuer Law Offices SC
Case Number: 2:2019cv01171
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Judge J.P. Stadtmueller on 10/10/2019. Interim Settlement Report due by 3/20/2020; Dispositive Motions due by 3/27/2020; Final Settlement Report due by 7/10/2020; Motions in Limine and Daubert Motions due by 7/16/2020; Final/Joint Pretrial Report due by 2:00 PM on 7/22/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/28/2020 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 425, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI before Judge J.P. Stadtmueller. Jury Trial set for 8/3/2020 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 425, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI before Judge J.P. Stadtmueller. See Order. (cc: all counsel)(km)
October 10, 2019 Filing 9 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge J. P. Stadtmueller: Scheduling Conference held on 10/10/2019 (Court Reporter John Schindhelm) (km)
October 9, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Heuer Law Offices SC - Waiver sent on 10/7/2019. (Pagel, Briane)
October 7, 2019 Filing 7 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan by Lindsay A Johnson. (Pagel, Briane)
October 4, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Alyssa A Johnson on behalf of Heuer Law Offices SC. Attorney(s) appearing: Alyssa A. Johnson (Johnson, Alyssa)
September 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 10/10/2019 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 425, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI before Judge J P Stadtmueller. Joint Rule 26 Plan due by 10/7/2019. (cc: all counsel)(jm)
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE Statement by Heuer Law Offices SC. (Hanus, David)
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by David J Hanus on behalf of Heuer Law Offices SC. Attorney(s) appearing: David J. Hanus (Hanus, David)
August 16, 2019 Summons Issued as to Heuer Law Offices, S.C.. (jcl)
August 14, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge J P Stadtmueller ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Jones to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Lindsay A. Johnson (Pagel, Briane)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against Heuer Law Offices, S.C. by Lindsay A. Johnson. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3188673) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pagel, Briane)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Heuer Law Offices SC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lindsay A. Johnson
Represented By: Briane F Pagel, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lindsay A Johnson
Represented By: Briane F Pagel, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heuer Law Offices, S.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heuer Law Offices SC
Represented By: Alyssa A Johnson
Represented By: David J Hanus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?