Nelson v. Saul
Plaintiff: Chanel Enjolique Nelson
Defendant: Nancy A Berryhill and Andrew M Saul
Case Number: 2:2019cv01172
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Nancy Joseph
Referring Judge: Pamela Pepper
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 Filing 10 Notice of Filing Administrative Transcript and Preservation of Rights filed by Andrew M Saul. (Attachments: #1 Transcript, #2 Transcript, #3 Transcript, #4 Transcript, #5 Transcript, #6 Transcript, #7 Transcript, #8 Transcript, #9 Transcript, #10 Transcript, #11 Transcript, #12 Transcript, #13 Transcript, #14 Transcript, #15 Transcript, #16 Transcript, #17 Transcript, #18 Transcript, #19 Transcript, #20 Transcript, #21 Transcript, #22 Transcript, #23 Transcript, #24 Transcript, #25 Transcript, #26 Transcript, #27 Transcript, #28 Transcript, #29 Transcript, #30 Transcript, #31 Transcript, #32 Transcript) (Pawlak, Brian)
October 11, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Social Security Transcript by Andrew M Saul (Pawlak, Brian)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE ON CONSENT signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 8/29/2019. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph for all further proceedings. Judge Pamela Pepper no longer assigned to case. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
August 28, 2019 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Chanel Enjolique Nelson. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Durkin, Thomas)
August 23, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Skutch Cohn on behalf of Andrew M Saul. Attorney(s) appearing: Emily S. Cohn (Cohn, Emily)
August 22, 2019 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Andrew M Saul. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Pawlak, Brian)
August 16, 2019 Filing 4 Briefing Letter electronically transmitted to parties. By 10/15/2019 defendant to file and serve certified administrative record. Plaintiff's brief due 11/25/2019; defendant's response due 1/6/2020; plaintiff's reply due 1/21/2020. (cc: all counsel) (cb)
August 16, 2019 NOTICE to Counsel: Andrew M Saul is now the Commissioner of Social Security. Pursuant to Rule 25(d) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Andrew M Saul is substituted for Nancy A Berryhill as the defendant in this suit. No further action need be taken to continue this suit by reason of the last sentence of section 205(g) of the Social Security Act, 42 U.S.C. 405(g).(asc)
August 15, 2019 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE Statement by Chanel Enjolique Nelson. (Durkin, Thomas)
August 15, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Chanel Enjolique Nelson (Durkin, Thomas)
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nancy A Berryhill by Chanel Enjolique Nelson. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3189742) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Durkin, Thomas)
August 15, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge Pamela Pepper ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website. (ds)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nelson v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chanel Enjolique Nelson
Represented By: Thomas W Durkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A Berryhill
Represented By: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Brian E Pawlak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M Saul
Represented By: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Brian E Pawlak
Represented By: Emily Skutch Cohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?