Meucci et al v. Aurora Health Plan et al
Plaintiff: Emil Meucci, Jr., Neurosurgery and Endovascular Associates, S.C., Neurosurgery and Endovascular Associates S C and Emil Meucci, Jr
Defendant: Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Aurora Health Network Plan, Aurora Health Care, Inc., Aurora Network Plan and Aurora Health Care Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv01188
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Lynn Adelman
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 Filing 12 BRIEF in Support filed by Aurora Health Care Inc, Aurora Network Plan, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin re #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Hofmeister, Daniel)
October 11, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Aurora Health Care Inc, Aurora Network Plan, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin. (Hofmeister, Daniel)
September 17, 2019 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE Statement by Aurora Health Care Inc, Aurora Network Plan, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin. (Carraher, Timothy)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 9/13/19 granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time. (cc: all counsel) (jad)
September 11, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Aurora Health Care Inc, Aurora Network Plan, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Carraher, Timothy)
September 10, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs on Aurora Network Plan (Harvey, Patrick)
September 10, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs on Aurora Health Care, Inc. (Harvey, Patrick)
September 10, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs on Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin d/b/a Anthem Blue Cross Blue Shield (Harvey, Patrick)
August 28, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Emil Meucci, Jr, Neurosurgery and Endovascular Associates SC. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Harvey, Patrick)
August 28, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service on Aurora Network Plan . (Harvey, Patrick)
August 20, 2019 Case Opening Modification(s); The following modification(s) have been made to your case entry: One or more party names have been modified - please remember to follow the Party Name Guidelines found on our website. ; Please refer to the # attorney case opening instructions, the # summons instructions and the # party name guidelines found in the user manual for further guidance NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re #1 Complaint, filed by Emil Meucci, Jr, Neurosurgery and Endovascular Associates SC ; All documents must contain an electronic signature. You must RE-FILE this document. Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (bx)
August 19, 2019 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (jcl)
August 19, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge Lynn Adelman ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Jones to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website. (ds)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by All Plaintiffs. (Harvey, Patrick)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Emil Meucci, Jr, Neurosurgery and Endovascular Associates, S.C.. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number BWIEDC-3191076) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Aurora Network Plan, #3 Summons Aurora Health Care, #4 Summons Blue Cross Blue Shield, #5 Exhibit 1, #6 Exhibit 2, #7 Exhibit 3)(Harvey, Patrick) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/20/2019: #8 signed Complaint) (jcl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meucci et al v. Aurora Health Plan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin
Represented By: Timothy R Carwinski
Represented By: Timothy R Carraher
Represented By: Daniel Hofmeister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurora Health Network Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurora Health Care, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurora Network Plan
Represented By: Timothy R Carwinski
Represented By: Timothy R Carraher
Represented By: Daniel Hofmeister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurora Health Care Inc
Represented By: Timothy R Carwinski
Represented By: Timothy R Carraher
Represented By: Daniel Hofmeister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emil Meucci, Jr.
Represented By: Patrick M Harvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neurosurgery and Endovascular Associates, S.C.
Represented By: Patrick M Harvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neurosurgery and Endovascular Associates S C
Represented By: Patrick M Harvey
Represented By: Melissa Baris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emil Meucci, Jr
Represented By: Patrick M Harvey
Represented By: Melissa Baris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?