City of Birmingham Retirement and Relief System v. AO Smith Corporation et al
Plaintiff: City of Birmingham Retirement and Relief System
Defendant: Ajita Rajendra, John Kita, AO Smith Corporation and Kevin Wheeler
Case Number: 2:2019cv01198
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Lynn Adelman
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2019 Filing 21 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by City of Birmingham Retirement and Relief System.(Kaplan, David)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Granting #19 Stipulation of Scheduling for Filing of Consolidated Complaint and Response signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 9/23/19. (cc: all counsel)(jad)
September 20, 2019 Filing 19 STIPULATION of Schedule for Filing of Consolidated Complaint and Response Thereto by City of Birmingham Retirement and Relief System. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Flanner, Mary)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Appointing City of Birmingham Retirement and Relief System as Lead Plaintiff and Approving Selection of Counsel signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 9/16/19. (cc: all counsel)(jad)
September 13, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE by City of Birmingham Retirement AND Relief System of Non-Opposition to Renewed Motion for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Selection of Counsel (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Flanner, Mary) Modified on 9/16/2019 (bx).
September 10, 2019 Filing 16 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by AO Smith Corporation, John Kita, Ajita Rajendra, Kevin Wheeler. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (George, Kathryn)
September 10, 2019 Filing 15 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by City of Birmingham Retirement and Relief System. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Kaplan, David)
August 20, 2019 Filing 14 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by City of Birmingham Retirement and Relief System. (Kaplan, David)
August 20, 2019 Filing 13 DISCLOSURE Statement by AO Smith Corporation, John Kita, Ajita Rajendra, Kevin Wheeler. (George, Kathryn)
August 20, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathryn K George on behalf of AO Smith Corporation, John Kita, Ajita Rajendra, Kevin Wheeler. Attorney(s) appearing: Kathryn George (George, Kathryn)
August 20, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas J Siciliano on behalf of AO Smith Corporation, John Kita, Ajita Rajendra, Kevin Wheeler. Attorney(s) appearing: Nicholas Siciliano (Siciliano, Nicholas)
August 20, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean M Berkowitz on behalf of AO Smith Corporation, John Kita, Ajita Rajendra, Kevin Wheeler. Attorney(s) appearing: Sean Berkowitz (Berkowitz, Sean)
August 20, 2019 Summons Issued as to AO Smith Corporation, John Kita, Ajita Rajendra, Kevin Wheeler. (bx)
August 20, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon Marsh on behalf of City of Birmingham Retirement and Relief System. Attorney(s) appearing: Brandon Marsh (Marsh, Brandon)
August 20, 2019 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE Statement by City of Birmingham Retirement and Relief System. (Kaplan, David)
August 20, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan D Imfeld on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney(s) appearing: Nathan D. Imfeld (Imfeld, Nathan)
August 20, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew J Wronski on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney(s) appearing: Andrew J. Wronski (Wronski, Andrew)
August 20, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan B House on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney(s) appearing: Bryan B. House (House, Bryan)
August 20, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge Lynn Adelman ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (ds)
August 19, 2019 Filing 4 DECLARATION of David R. Kaplan in Support of City of Birmingham Retirement and Relief System's Renewed Motion for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Selection of Counsel (Attachments: #1 Ex. A: Notice of Pendency of Class Action, #2 Ex. B: Certification of Birmingham, #3 Ex. C: Chart of Estimated Loss, #4 Ex. D: Firm Bio Saxena White, #5 Ex. E: Firm Bio Cross Law Firm)(Kaplan, David)
August 19, 2019 Filing 3 BRIEF in Support filed by City of Birmingham Retirement and Relief System re #2 MOTION for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Selection of Counsel [Renewed] . (Kaplan, David)
August 19, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Selection of Counsel [Renewed] by City of Birmingham Retirement and Relief System. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kaplan, David)
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Class Action Complaint for Violations of the Federal Securities Laws with Jury Demand; against AO Smith Corporation, John Kita, Ajita Rajendra, Kevin Wheeler by City of Birmingham Retirement and Relief System. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3192842) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons AO Smith Corporation, #3 Summons Ajita Rajendra, #4 Summons Kevin Wheeler, #5 Summons John Kita)(Kaplan, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Birmingham Retirement and Relief System v. AO Smith Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Birmingham Retirement and Relief System
Represented By: David Kaplan
Represented By: Lester R Hooker
Represented By: Nola J Hitchcock Cross
Represented By: Steven B Singer
Represented By: Mary C Flanner
Represented By: Brandon Marsh
Represented By: Dianne M Pitre
Represented By: Joseph E White, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ajita Rajendra
Represented By: Kathryn K George
Represented By: Bryan B House
Represented By: Nathan D Imfeld
Represented By: Andrew J Wronski
Represented By: Nicholas J Siciliano
Represented By: Sean M Berkowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Kita
Represented By: Kathryn K George
Represented By: Bryan B House
Represented By: Nathan D Imfeld
Represented By: Andrew J Wronski
Represented By: Nicholas J Siciliano
Represented By: Sean M Berkowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AO Smith Corporation
Represented By: Kathryn K George
Represented By: Bryan B House
Represented By: Nathan D Imfeld
Represented By: Andrew J Wronski
Represented By: Nicholas J Siciliano
Represented By: Sean M Berkowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Wheeler
Represented By: Kathryn K George
Represented By: Bryan B House
Represented By: Nathan D Imfeld
Represented By: Andrew J Wronski
Represented By: Nicholas J Siciliano
Represented By: Sean M Berkowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?