Vlasak v. Central Research, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jennifer Vlasak
Defendant: Central Research, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv01207
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William E Duffin
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ONLY ORDER: The court finding good cause, the defendant's motion for an extension of time (ECF No. #7 ) is granted. Central Research, Inc. shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint no later than October 24, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 10/17/2019. (cc: all counsel) (mlm)
October 17, 2019 Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction (mlm)
October 16, 2019 Filing 9 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Central Research, Inc.. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Feinberg, Daniel)
September 27, 2019 NOTICE from the clerk to Defendant requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge William E. Duffin be filed within 21 days; the form is available at the court's web site: www.wied.uscourts.gov (mlm)
September 25, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel E Feinberg on behalf of Central Research, Inc.. Attorney(s) appearing: Daniel E. Feinberg (Feinberg, Daniel)
September 25, 2019 Filing 7 Rule 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint by Central Research, Inc.. (Patel, Chirag)
September 25, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Chirag Haresh Patel on behalf of Central Research, Inc.. Attorney(s) appearing: Chirag H. Patel (Patel, Chirag)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 8/27/2019. The plaintiff's motion to stay further proceedings on the motion for class certification is granted. The parties are relieved from the automatic briefing schedule set forth in Civil Local Rule 7(b) and (c). Moreover, for administrative purposes, it is necessary that the Clerk terminate the plaintiff's motion for class certification. However, this motion will be regarded as pending to serve its protective purpose under Damasco. (cc: all counsel) (mlm)
August 23, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Jennifer Vlasak. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Eldridge, Mark)
August 20, 2019 Summons Issued as to Central Research, Inc. (mlm)
August 20, 2019 Case Opening Error: All documents should contain the s/signature of the attorney who files the document. This document does not need to be re-filed; Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov. (mlm)
August 20, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Certify Class (Damasco, Campbell-Ewald), Rule 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive MOTION for Relief from memorandum, supporting documents, and automatic briefing requirements, Rule 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive MOTION to Stay the motion for class certification until the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference by Jennifer Vlasak. (Eldridge, Mark)
August 20, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by Jennifer Vlasak. (Eldridge, Mark)
August 20, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge William E Duffin ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (class action) with Jury Demand; against Central Research, Inc. by Jennifer Vlasak. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3194510) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: letter from Defendant to Plaintiff, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Eldridge, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vlasak v. Central Research, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Vlasak
Represented By: Jesse Fruchter
Represented By: John D Blythin
Represented By: Ben J Slatky
Represented By: Mark A Eldridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Research, Inc.
Represented By: Chirag Haresh Patel
Represented By: Daniel E Feinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?