Simpson, Willie v. Green Bay Correctional Institution et al
Plaintiff: Willie C Simpson
Defendant: CO Lueterman, Jean Lutsey, Drew Weycker, Capt. Vanlanan, Kevin A Carr, Sgt. Friedel, Sue Peters, CO FruiBrodtte, Tony Evers, Capt. Bauman, Sgt. Retlaff, Capt. Elsinger, CO Deidrick, Debra Hert, Ernie, Green Bay Correctional Institution and CO Korpitta
Case Number: 2:2019cv01222
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Office: Milwaukee Office
Presiding Judge: Pamela Pepper
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Filing 16 LETTER from the clerk to plaintiff re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge Joseph and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. (jcl)
August 22, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge Pamela Pepper ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website (jcl)
August 22, 2019 Filing 15 Case transferred in from District of Wisconsin Western; Case Number 3:19-cv-00525. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER that the state defendants' motion to transfer these cases, Dkt. 37 in case no. 18-467, is GRANTED in part.Case nos. 19-cv-524-jdp and 19-cv-525-jdp are TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin. Case no. 18-cv-467-jdp will remain in this court. Plaintiff Willie Simpson's motion for reconsideration of the court's July 3, 2019 decision denying his motion for preliminary injunctive relief, Dkt. 38 , is DENIED. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 8/21/2019. (rks),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 8/22/2019.]
August 14, 2019 Filing 13 Declaration of Kevin Grzebielski filed by Defendants Bauman, Kevin A. Carr, Deidrick, Deidrick, Elsinger, Ernie, Tony Evers, Friedel, FruiBrodtte, Green Bay Correctional Institution, Hert, Korpitta, Lueterman, Jean Lutsey, Sue Peters, Retlaff, Vanlanan, Weycker re: #5 Motion to Transfer, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1000 - 6/13/18 Letter to Administrator, #2 Exhibit 1001 - 6/20/18 Notice of Appearance) (Grzebielski, Kevin),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 8/22/2019.]
August 13, 2019 Filing 12 Disregard. See #13 . Modified on 8/15/2019. (lak) [Transferred from wiwd on 8/22/2019.]
August 13, 2019 Filing 11 Brief in Reply by Defendants Bauman, Kevin A. Carr, Deidrick, Deidrick, Elsinger, Ernie, Tony Evers, Friedel, FruiBrodtte, Green Bay Correctional Institution, Hert, Korpitta, Lueterman, Jean Lutsey, Sue Peters, Retlaff, Vanlanan, Weycker in Support of #5 Motion to Transfer, (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Grzebielski, Kevin),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 8/22/2019.]
August 6, 2019 Filing 10 Affidavit of Willie Simpson in Support of #9 Brief in Opposition to #5 MOTION TO TRANSFER to Eastern District of WI. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint filed in Dane County Circuit Court Case No. 18CV1093, #2 Exhibit 2 - Summons filed in Dane County Circuit Court Case No. 18CV1093, #3 Exhibit 3 - Summons and Proof of Service filed in Dane County Circuit Court Case No. 18CV1093, #4 Exhibit 4 - Electronic Filing Notice filed in Dane County Circuit Court Case No. 18CV1093) (nln),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 8/22/2019.]
August 6, 2019 Filing 9 Brief in Opposition by Plaintiff Willie Simpson re: Defendants' #5 Motion to Transfer. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Mailing) (nln),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 8/22/2019.]
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **Plaintiff's motion for an extension of time to oppose defendants' motion to transfer case nos. 19-cv-524 and 19-cv-525 is GRANTED. Plaintiff may have until August 6, 2019, to submit his brief opposing transfer in each case. Defendants may have until August 13, 2019 to file their reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 7/30/2019. (nln),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 8/22/2019.]
July 23, 2019 Filing 7 Affidavit of Willie Simpson in Support of #6 Motion for Extension of Time. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Inmate Complaint) (nln),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 8/22/2019.]
July 23, 2019 Filing 6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief in Opposition, by Plaintiff Willie Simpson. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Mailing) (nln),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 8/22/2019.]
July 9, 2019 Set Briefing Deadlines as to #5 MOTION TO TRANSFER to Eastern District of WI . Plaintiff's Brief in Opposition due 7/23/2019. Defendants' Brief in Reply due 7/30/2019. (nln),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 8/22/2019.]
July 9, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION TO TRANSFER to Eastern District of WI by Defendants Bauman, Kevin A. Carr, Deidrick, Deidrick, Elsinger, Ernie, Tony Evers, Friedel, FruiBrodtte, Green Bay Correctional Institution, Hert, Korpitta, Lueterman, Jean Lutsey, Retlaff, Vanlanan, Weycker. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Grzebielski, Kevin),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 8/22/2019.]
July 2, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance (Limited) filed by Kevin L Grzebielski for Defendants Bauman, Kevin A. Carr, Deidrick, Deidrick, Elsinger, Ernie, Tony Evers, Friedel, FruiBrodtte, Green Bay Correctional Institution, Hert, Korpitta, Lueterman, Jean Lutsey, Retlaff, Vanlanan, Weycker. (Grzebielski, Kevin),(ps) Modified on 7/3/2019. (lak) [Transferred from wiwd on 8/22/2019.]
July 2, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance (Limited) filed by Rachel Lee Bachhuber for Defendants Bauman, Kevin A. Carr, Deidrick, Deidrick, Elsinger, Ernie, Tony Evers, Friedel, FruiBrodtte, Green Bay Correctional Institution, Hert, Korpitta, Lueterman, Jean Lutsey, Retlaff, Vanlanan. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Bachhuber, Rachel),(ps) Modified on 7/3/2019. (lak) [Transferred from wiwd on 8/22/2019.]
June 27, 2019 $400 filing fee paid; receipt number 0758-2492065. (Bachhuber, Rachel),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 8/22/2019.]
June 25, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT (same as dkt. 18 amended complaint in case 18-cv-467-jdp) against All Defendants, filed by Willie Simpson. (Case non-randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C - Copy of Letter Response) (jef),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 8/22/2019.]
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 ORDER granting plaintiff Willie Simpson's 17 motion for leave to amend his complaint. The clerk of court is directed to open plaintiff's amended complaint, Dkt. 18 , under two new case numbers. The court will consider Simpson's HIV-treatment and mail-interception claims in the two new cases. Defendants may have until July 9, 2019, to make two additional $400 filing-fee payments. Defendants may have until July 9, 2019, to renew their motion to transfer any or all of the now-separated lawsuits. Defendants may have until July 2, 2019, to respond to plaintiff's allegations regarding his nutritional supplement. Plaintiff's remaining motions are DENIED. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 6/12/2019. (jef),(ps) Clerk's office note: new case numbers are 19-cv-524 and 19-cv-525. (jef) [Transferred from wiwd on 8/22/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simpson, Willie v. Green Bay Correctional Institution et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO Lueterman
Represented By: Rachel L Bachhuber
Represented By: Kevin L Grzebielski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jean Lutsey
Represented By: Rachel L Bachhuber
Represented By: Kevin L Grzebielski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Drew Weycker
Represented By: Kevin L Grzebielski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capt. Vanlanan
Represented By: Rachel L Bachhuber
Represented By: Kevin L Grzebielski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin A Carr
Represented By: Rachel L Bachhuber
Represented By: Kevin L Grzebielski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Friedel
Represented By: Rachel L Bachhuber
Represented By: Kevin L Grzebielski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sue Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO FruiBrodtte
Represented By: Rachel L Bachhuber
Represented By: Kevin L Grzebielski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Evers
Represented By: Rachel L Bachhuber
Represented By: Kevin L Grzebielski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capt. Bauman
Represented By: Rachel L Bachhuber
Represented By: Kevin L Grzebielski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Retlaff
Represented By: Rachel L Bachhuber
Represented By: Kevin L Grzebielski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capt. Elsinger
Represented By: Rachel L Bachhuber
Represented By: Kevin L Grzebielski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO Deidrick
Represented By: Rachel L Bachhuber
Represented By: Kevin L Grzebielski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra Hert
Represented By: Rachel L Bachhuber
Represented By: Kevin L Grzebielski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ernie
Represented By: Rachel L Bachhuber
Represented By: Kevin L Grzebielski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green Bay Correctional Institution
Represented By: Rachel L Bachhuber
Represented By: Kevin L Grzebielski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO Korpitta
Represented By: Rachel L Bachhuber
Represented By: Kevin L Grzebielski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie C Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?