Thomas et al v. Brinks Inc et al
Plaintiff: James Thomas
Defendant: Brink's, Inc., Baldwin & Lyons, Inc., Brinks Inc and Baldwin & Lyons Inc
Not Yet Classified: United Healthcare Insurance Company and Middlesex Insurance Co
Case Number: 2:2019cv01224
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 23:134
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Shimon B Kahan on behalf of Baldwin & Lyons Inc, Brinks Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Shimon B. Kahan (Kahan, Shimon)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Judge J.P. Stadtmueller on 9/13/19. Interim Settlement Report due by 3/17/20; Dispositive Motions due by 3/20/20; Final Settlement Report due by 7/7/20; Motions in Limine and Daubert Motions due by 7/10/20; Final/Joint Pretrial Report due by 2:00 PM on 7/15/20. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/21/20 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 425, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI before Judge J.P. Stadtmueller. Jury Trial set for 7/27/20 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 425, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI before Judge J.P. Stadtmueller. See Order. (cc: all counsel)(cl)
September 13, 2019 Filing 11 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge J.P. Stadtmueller: Scheduling Conference held on 9/13/2019. (Court Reporter Thomas Malkiewicz) (cl)
September 10, 2019 Filing 10 Initial Joint Status REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan & Discovery by James Thomas. (DeVinney, Drew)
September 6, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint AND COUNTERCLAIM against Baldwin & Lyons Inc. and Brinks Inc. filed by Middlesex Insurance Co ., ANSWER to Complaint AND CROSSCLAIM against Baldwin & Lyons Inc. and Brinks Inc. filed by Middlesex Insurance Co. (Theesfeld, Phillip)
September 4, 2019 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by All Defendants. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (LaFlamme, Eugene)
September 4, 2019 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by James Thomas. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (DeVinney, Drew)
September 4, 2019 NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re #5 Consent/Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge filed by James Thomas ; Document must contain the name of the assigned magistrate judge. This document must be RE-FILED; Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (asc)
September 3, 2019 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE Statement by James Thomas. (DeVinney, Drew)
September 3, 2019 Filing 5 DISREGARD; INCORRECT DOCUMENT Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by James Thomas. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (DeVinney, Drew) Modified on 9/4/2019 (asc).
August 29, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by All Defendants.(LaFlamme, Eugene)
August 27, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 9/13/2019 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 425, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI before Judge J P Stadtmueller. Joint Rule 26 Plan due by 9/10/2019. (cc: all counsel)(jm)
August 23, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge J P Stadtmueller ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Jones to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website (jcl)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by All Defendants. (LaFlamme, Eugene)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Brink's, Inc., Baldwin & Lyons, Inc. from Milwaukee County Circuit Court, Case Number: 19-CV-5522 with attached state court documents. (Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3197942) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Certified Summons & Complaint, #2 Exhibit B-Circuit Court file, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(LaFlamme, Eugene)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas et al v. Brinks Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brink's, Inc.
Represented By: Eugene M LaFlamme
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baldwin & Lyons, Inc.
Represented By: Eugene M LaFlamme
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brinks Inc
Represented By: Eugene M LaFlamme
Represented By: Shimon B Kahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baldwin & Lyons Inc
Represented By: Eugene M LaFlamme
Represented By: Shimon B Kahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: United Healthcare Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Middlesex Insurance Co
Represented By: Phillip C Theesfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Thomas
Represented By: Drew J DeVinney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?