Murphy v. Wisconsin Central Limited
Plaintiff: Frank Murphy
Defendant: Canadian National Railroad Company and Wisconsin Central Ltd
Case Number: 2:2019cv01232
Filed: August 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Nancy Joseph
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 20, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order NOTICE from the clerk to DEFENDANT requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph be filed within 21 days; the form is available at the court's web site: www.wied.uscourts.gov (ds)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 DISCLOSURE Statement by Wisconsin Central Ltd. (Helenhouse, James)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Wisconsin Central Ltd. (Helenhouse, James)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ANSWER to #11 Second Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Wisconsin Central Ltd.(Helenhouse, James)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by James D Helenhouse on behalf of Wisconsin Central Ltd. Attorney(s) appearing: James D. Helenhouse (Helenhouse, James)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 DISCLOSURE Statement by Frank Murphy. (Bremseth, Fredric)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Wisconsin Central Limited Canadian National Railroad Company filed by Frank Murphy.(Bremseth, Fredric) Modified on 10/4/2019 (blr).
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Frank Murphy. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Bremseth, Fredric)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Fredric A Bremseth on behalf of Frank Murphy. Attorney(s) appearing: Fredric A. Bremseth (Bremseth, Fredric)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order SECOND NOTICE from the clerk to PLAINTIFF requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph be filed no later than October 4, 2019. The form is available at the court's web site: www.wied.uscourts.gov (blr)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Frank Murphy. Canadian National Railroad Company served on 9/18/2019 9/19/2019. (Bremseth, Fredric) Modified on 9/24/2019 (blr).
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order FINAL NOTICE to Plaintiff - Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement should have been filed with your first pleading. Please file your disclosure statement within 7 days. (blr)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Summons Issued as to Canadian National Railroad Company. (blr)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Frank Murphy (Bremseth, Fredric)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Case Opening Modification(s); The following modification(s) have been made to your case entry: The attached summons is blank and cannot be issued. Please re-file a completed summons using the event Request for Issuance of Summons. Please refer to the # summons instructions for further guidance. (blr)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Fredric A Bremseth on behalf of Frank Murphy. Attorney(s) appearing: Fredric A. Bremseth (Bremseth, Fredric)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Frank Murphy (Bremseth, Fredric)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Frank Murphy. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Bremseth, Fredric)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order SECOND NOTICE - Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement should have been filed with your first pleading. Please file your disclosure statement within 7 days. (blr)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Frank Murphy (Bremseth, Fredric)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Case Opening Modification(s); The following modification(s) have been made to your case entry: The attached summons is not complete and cannot be issued as this time. Please complete all relevant portions of the summons and re-file as a fillable PDF so it can be issued electronically. Please use the event Request for Issuance of Summons when re-filing. Please refer to the # summons instructions for further guidance. (blr)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Frank Murphy (Bremseth, Fredric)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against Frank Murphy by Frank Murphy. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3199712)(Bremseth, Fredric) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/26/2019: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ds).
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (ds)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murphy v. Wisconsin Central Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Canadian National Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wisconsin Central Ltd
Represented By: James D Helenhouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Murphy
Represented By: Fredric A Bremseth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?