Lopez v. Brown County Sheriff's Department et al
Petitioner: Phillip Lopez
Respondent: Brown County Sheriff's Department and Brown County Jail
Case Number: 2:2019cv01248
Filed: August 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Nancy Joseph
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 28:1651
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph on 9/18/2019 finding as moot #6 Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee. Plaintiff voluntarily dismissed this matter (Docket # 4) and the case has been terminated, rendering this motion moot. (cc: all counsel) (aw)
September 18, 2019 Filing 7 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Phillip Lopez. (mac)
September 18, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Phillip Lopez. (mac)
September 18, 2019 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Phillip Lopez. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (mac)
September 12, 2019 Case Terminated pursuant to #4 . (asc)
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Phillip Lopez LETTER from Phillip Lopez advising the Court that this case has been misfiled with the federal court and requesting that it be filed with the circuit court in the appropriate jurisdiction. (tlf) Modified on 9/13/2019 (asc).
August 27, 2019 Filing 3 LETTER from the clerk to Phillip Lopez re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. Also requesting payment of the full filing fee or that a petition to proceed without prepayment of the full filing fee and six-month certified trust account statement be filed within 21 days. (mac)
August 26, 2019 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT of Phillip Lopez. (mac)
August 26, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Mandamus filed by Phillip Lopez. (mac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lopez v. Brown County Sheriff's Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Brown County Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Brown County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Phillip Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?