Gibson et al v. PPH Properties I LLC
Plaintiff: Cielo Jean Gibson and Tiffany Toth Gray
Defendant: PPH Properties I LLC and Silk Exotic Milwaukee
Case Number: 2:2019cv01270
Filed: August 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Nancy Joseph
Referring Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Judge J.P. Stadtmueller on 10/25/2019. Interim Settlement Report due by 4/3/2020; Dispositive Motions due by 4/10/2020; Final Settlement Report due by 7/20/2020; Motions in Limine and Daubert Motions due by 7/24/2020; Final/Joint Pretrial Report due by 2:00 PM on 7/29/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/4/2020 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 425, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI before Judge J.P. Stadtmueller. Jury Trial set for 8/10/2020 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 425, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI before Judge J.P. Stadtmueller. See Order. (cc: all counsel)(nb)
October 25, 2019 Filing 10 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge J. P. Stadtmueller: Scheduling Conference held on 10/25/2019. (Court Reporter Susan Armbruster) (nb)
October 22, 2019 Filing 9 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan by All Plaintiffs. (Aronowitz, Edmund)
October 10, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel K Mullin on behalf of PPH Properties I LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: Daniel K. Mullin (Mullin, Daniel)
October 4, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 10/25/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 425, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI before Judge J P Stadtmueller. Joint Rule 26 Plan due by 10/22/2019. (cc: all counsel)(jm)
October 3, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by PPH Properties I LLC.(Nichols, Jeffrey)
October 3, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey T Nichols on behalf of PPH Properties I LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: Jeffrey T. Nichols (Nichols, Jeffrey)
September 30, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. All Defendants served 9/16/2019. (Aronowitz, Edmund) Modified on 10/1/2019 (blr).
September 13, 2019 Case reassigned to Judge J P Stadtmueller. Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph no longer assigned to the case. (asc)
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by All Plaintiffs. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Aronowitz, Edmund)
August 30, 2019 Summons Issued as to PPH Properties I LLC. (blr)
August 30, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by All Plaintiffs. (Aronowitz, Edmund)
August 30, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (ds)
August 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against PPH Properties I LLC by Cielo Jean Gibson, Tiffany Toth Gray. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3204361) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Aronowitz, Edmund)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gibson et al v. PPH Properties I LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PPH Properties I LLC
Represented By: Daniel K Mullin
Represented By: Jeffrey T Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silk Exotic Milwaukee
Represented By: Daniel K Mullin
Represented By: Jeffrey T Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cielo Jean Gibson
Represented By: Edmund S Aronowitz
Represented By: Paul K Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Toth Gray
Represented By: Edmund S Aronowitz
Represented By: Paul K Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?