Darling v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Wesley Evan Darling, Jr
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2019cv01272
Filed: August 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:416
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 Filing 7 Return of Service of Complaint by Certified Mail; US Attorney General served on 9/10/2019. (blr)
September 11, 2019 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Commissioner of Social Security. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Pawlak, Brian)
September 5, 2019 Filing 5 Briefing Letter electronically transmitted to parties. By 11/4/2019 defendant to file and serve certified administrative record. Plaintiff's brief due 12/16/2019; defendant's response due 1/27/2020; plaintiff's reply due 2/11/2020. (cc: all counsel) (cb)
September 4, 2019 Transmit #1 Complaint and #4 Order via certified mail to the Commissioner of Social Security and the US Attorney General; US Attorney served electronically via CM/ECF. (blr)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 9/3/2019 GRANTING #3 plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed without prepaying filing fee. (cc: all counsel) (cb)
September 3, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge Pamela Pepper ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website. (ds)
August 31, 2019 Filing 3 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Wesley Evan Darling, Jr. (Skaar, Daniel)
August 31, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by Wesley Evan Darling, Jr. (Skaar, Daniel)
August 31, 2019 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Administration filed by Wesley Evan Darling, Jr (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Appeals Council Denial, #3 Exhibit Unfavorable Notice of Decision)(Skaar, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Darling v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wesley Evan Darling, Jr
Represented By: Daniel A Skaar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?