Bogosian v. Saul
Plaintiff: Brenda Bogosian
Defendant: Andrew M Saul
Case Number: 2:2019cv01275
Filed: September 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William E Duffin
Referring Judge: Pamela Pepper
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 Filing 12 Notice of Filing Administrative Transcript and Preservation of Rights filed by Andrew M Saul. (Attachments: #1 Transcript, #2 Transcript, #3 Transcript, #4 Transcript, #5 Transcript, #6 Transcript, #7 Transcript, #8 Transcript, #9 Transcript, #10 Transcript, #11 Transcript, #12 Transcript, #13 Transcript, #14 Transcript, #15 Transcript, #16 Transcript, #17 Transcript, #18 Transcript, #19 Transcript, #20 Transcript, #21 Transcript, #22 Transcript, #23 Transcript, #24 Transcript, #25 Transcript, #26 Transcript, #27 Transcript, #28 Transcript, #29 Transcript, #30 Transcript, #31 Transcript, #32 Transcript, #33 Transcript, #34 Transcript, #35 Transcript, #36 Transcript, #37 Transcript, #38 Transcript, #39 Transcript, #40 Transcript, #41 Transcript, #42 Transcript, #43 Transcript, #44 Transcript, #45 Transcript, #46 Transcript, #47 Transcript) (Pawlak, Brian)
November 1, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Social Security Transcript by Andrew M Saul (Pawlak, Brian)
September 27, 2019 NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re #10 Certificate of Service - Social Security Transcript filed by Brenda Bogosian; The incorrect event was chosen; The correct event was declaration. This document does not need to be re-filed. Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (blr)
September 26, 2019 Filing 10 DECLARATION of Service via certified mail. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Social Security Transcript by Brenda Bogosian (Attachments: #1 Supplement) (Brzezinski, James) Modified on 9/27/2019 (blr).
September 16, 2019 Filing 9 Return of Service of Complaint by Certified Mail; US Attorney General served on 9/9/2019. (blr)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE ON CONSENT signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 9/12/2019. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge William E. Duffin for all further proceedings. Judge Pamela Pepper no longer assigned to case. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
September 11, 2019 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Andrew M Saul. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Pawlak, Brian)
September 5, 2019 Filing 6 Briefing Letter electronically transmitted to parties. By 11/4/2019 defendant to file and serve certified administrative record. Plaintiff's brief due 12/16/2019; defendant's response due 1/27/2020; plaintiff's reply due 2/11/2020. (cc: all counsel) (cb)
September 4, 2019 Transmit #1 Complaint and #5 Order via certified mail to the Commissioner of Social Security and the US Attorney General; US Attorney served electronically via CM/ECF. (blr)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 9/4/2019 GRANTING #2 plaintiff's motion to proceed without prepaying filing fee. (cc: all counsel) (cb)
September 3, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Brenda Bogosian. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Brzezinski, James)
September 3, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge Pamela Pepper ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website. (ds)
September 3, 2019 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE Statement by Brenda Bogosian. (Brzezinski, James)
September 3, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Brenda Bogosian. (Brzezinski, James)
September 3, 2019 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Administration filed by Brenda Bogosian (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Brzezinski, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bogosian v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M Saul
Represented By: Brian E Pawlak
Represented By: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Bogosian
Represented By: James M Brzezinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?