Hespel et al v. SSC Pleasant Prairie Operating Company LLC
Plaintiff: Michael W Hespel, Mark Hespel and Estate of Robert H Hespel
Defendant: SSC Pleasant Prairie Operating Company LLC and ABC Insurance Company
Not Yet Classified: Wisconsin Department of Services, US Department of Health and Human Services, UnitedHealthcare of Wisconsin Inc and Alex Azar
Case Number: 2:2019cv01289
Filed: September 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Nancy Joseph
Referring Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 10/24/2019. #15 Parties' Joint Stipulation of Dismissal is ADOPTED; CASE DISMISSED without prejudice and without costs. #10 Motion to Dismiss Party, #12 Motion to Compel Arbitration, and #13 Motion to Stay are DENIED as moot. (cc: all counsel)(jm)
October 23, 2019 Filing 15 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Estate of Robert H Hespel, Mark Hespel, Michael W Hespel. (Martin, Kevin)
October 21, 2019 Filing 14 PROPOSED Proposed Order Granting a Stipulation for Stay of Action filed by SSC Pleasant Prairie Operating Company LLC. (Carden, Terrence)
October 21, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Stay of Action by SSC Pleasant Prairie Operating Company LLC. (Carden, Terrence)
October 10, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Stay and Compel Enforcement of the Dispute Resolution Program Agreement by SSC Pleasant Prairie Operating Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Carden, Terrence)
October 9, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 10/25/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 425, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI before Judge J P Stadtmueller. Joint Rule 26 Plan due by 10/22/2019. (cc: all counsel)(jm)
October 4, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss Party State of Wisconsin Department of Health Services by Wisconsin Department of Services. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order DHS Order of Dismissal, #2 Affidavit DHS Schuh Affidavit in Support, #3 Certificate of Service DHS Certificate of Service)(Schuh, Dennis)
October 4, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis C Schuh on behalf of Wisconsin Department of Services. Attorney(s) appearing: Dennis C. Schuh (Schuh, Dennis)
October 4, 2019 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE Statement by All Plaintiffs. (Martin, Kevin)
September 25, 2019 Filing 7 PROPOSED Order Granting Defendant Levae to File its Answer or Otherwise Plead filed by SSC Pleasant Prairie Operating Company LLC. (Carden, Terrence)
September 25, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION for Time to File Responsive Pleading by SSC Pleasant Prairie Operating Company LLC. (Carden, Terrence)
September 17, 2019 Case reassigned to Judge J P Stadtmueller. Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph no longer assigned to the case. (asc)
September 16, 2019 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by SSC Pleasant Prairie Operating Company LLC. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Carden, Terrence)
September 5, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph. Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website. (ds)
September 5, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca Barnard on behalf of SSC Pleasant Prairie Operating Company LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: Rebecca C. Barnard (Barnard, Rebecca)
September 5, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Terrence S Carden, III on behalf of SSC Pleasant Prairie Operating Company LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: Terrence S. Carden, III (Carden, Terrence)
September 5, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by SSC Pleasant Prairie Operating Company LLC. (Carden, Terrence)
September 5, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by SSC Pleasant Prairie Operating Company LLC from Kenosha County Circuit Court, Case Number: 2019CV000881 with attached state court documents. (Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3208240) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Carden, Terrence) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/5/2019: #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (ds).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hespel et al v. SSC Pleasant Prairie Operating Company LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael W Hespel
Represented By: Kevin R Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Hespel
Represented By: Kevin R Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Robert H Hespel
Represented By: Kevin R Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Pleasant Prairie Operating Company LLC
Represented By: Terrence S Carden, III
Represented By: Rebecca Barnard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Wisconsin Department of Services
Represented By: Dennis C Schuh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: US Department of Health and Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: UnitedHealthcare of Wisconsin Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Alex Azar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?