Dolge v. Saul
Plaintiff: Amanda Dolge
Defendant: Andrew M Saul
Case Number: 2:2019cv01331
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Nancy Joseph
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2019 Filing 10 Return of Service of Complaint by Certified Mail; US Attorney General served on 9/30/2019. (blr)
September 30, 2019 Filing 9 Return of Service of Complaint by Certified Mail; Commissioner of Social Security served on 9/27/2019. (blr)
September 23, 2019 Filing 8 Briefing Letter electronically transmitted to the parties: Plaintiff's brief due January 2, 2020; Defendant's response due February 11, 2020; Plaintiff's reply due February 26, 2020. (cc: all counsel) (blr)
September 23, 2019 Transmit #1 Complaint and #5 Order via certified mail to the Commissioner of Social Security and the US Attorney General; US Attorney served electronically via CM/ECF. (blr)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE ON CONSENT signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 9/19/2019. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph for all further proceedings. Judge Pamela Pepper no longer assigned to case. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
September 18, 2019 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Andrew M Saul. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Pawlak, Brian)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 9/17/2019 GRANTING #2 plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed without prepaying filing fee. (cc: all counsel) (cb)
September 13, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Amanda Dolge. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Traver, David)
September 13, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge Pamela Pepper ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website (jcl)
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE Statement by Amanda Dolge. (Traver, David)
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Amanda Dolge. (Traver, David)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew M Saul by Amanda Dolge. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Traver, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dolge v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Dolge
Represented By: David F Traver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M Saul
Represented By: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Brian E Pawlak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?