Leal v. Saul
Plaintiff: Christina Leal
Defendant: Andrew M Saul
Case Number: 2:2019cv01356
Filed: September 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William E Duffin
Referring Judge: Pamela Pepper
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2019 Filing 10 Return of Service of Complaint by Certified Mail; US Attorney General served on 9/30/2019. (blr)
September 30, 2019 Filing 9 Return of Service of Complaint by Certified Mail; Commissioner of Social Security served on 9/27/2019. (blr)
September 27, 2019 Filing 8 Briefing Letter electronically transmitted to the parties: Plaintiff's brief due January 6, 2020; Defendant's response due February 18, 2020; Plaintiff's reply due March 4, 2020. (cc: all counsel) (blr)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE ON CONSENT signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 9/26/2019. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge William E. Duffin for all further proceedings. Judge Pamela Pepper no longer assigned to case. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
September 25, 2019 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Christina Leal. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Durkin, Thomas)
September 23, 2019 Transmit #1 Complaint and #4 Order via certified mail to the Commissioner of Social Security and the US Attorney General; US Attorney served electronically via CM/ECF. (blr)
September 19, 2019 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Andrew M Saul. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Pawlak, Brian)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 9/18/2019 GRANTING #2 plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed without prepaying filing fee. (cc: all counsel) (cb)
September 17, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge Pamela Pepper ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)
September 17, 2019 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE Statement by Christina Leal. (Durkin, Thomas)
September 17, 2019 Filing 2 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Christina Leal. (Durkin, Thomas)
September 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew M Saul by Christina Leal. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Durkin, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leal v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Leal
Represented By: Thomas W Durkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M Saul
Represented By: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Brian E Pawlak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?