Nelson v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: David Darnell Nelson, Jr and David Darnell Nelson
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2019cv01387
Filed: September 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Pamela Pepper
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, Statement of Further Case Information and Request That All of His Cases be Accepted filed by plaintiff David Darnell Nelson, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Additional case information, #2 Envelope)(vkb)
October 30, 2019 Filing 7 LETTER from plaintiff re: health condition. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(amb)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 10/15/2019. Plaintiff not required to pay initial partial filing fee. If plaintiff wishes to voluntarily dismiss case to avoid paying filing fee in installments or to avoid having the court later dismiss it as frivolous or malicious, he must notify the court on or before 11/5/2019. (cc: all counsel, via mail to David Nelson and Warden at Milwaukee Secure Detention Facility)(cb)
October 7, 2019 Filing 5 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by David Darnell Nelson, Jr. (amb)
October 7, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by David Darnell Nelson, Jr. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (amb)
September 24, 2019 Filing 3 LETTER from the clerk to Plaintiff re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge William E. Duffin and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. Also requesting that a six-month certified prisoner trust account statement be filed within 21 days. (ds)
September 23, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by David Darnell Nelson, Jr. (ds)
September 23, 2019 Filing 1 PRISONERSOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Administration filed by David Darnell Nelson, Jr. Consent forms distributed to the parties for Magistrate Judge William E. Duffin. (ds) Modified on 9/24/2019 (kmm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nelson v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Darnell Nelson, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Darnell Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?