United States of America v. Approximately $40238 US Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Approximately $40238 US Currency
Claimant: Tasnique Love
Case Number: 2:2019cv01443
Filed: October 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William E Duffin
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2019 Filing 11 DECLARATION of Publication (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Campbell, Scott)
October 29, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE by United States of America to Bobby Watkins, c/o Attorney Muller, of Complaint for Civil Forfeiture of Property (Campbell, Scott)
October 23, 2019 Filing 9 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form (signed) filed by Tasnique Love. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (mlm)
October 16, 2019 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form (no actual signature). (Attachments: #1 Clerk's Letter returning unsigned consent form to Ms. Love) (mlm).
October 8, 2019 Filing 7 US Marshal 285 Form executed - defendant currency in USMS custody (Campbell, Scott)
October 3, 2019 Warrant for Arrest in Rem Issued (mlm)
October 2, 2019 Filing 6 LETTER from AUSA Scott J. Campbell to Clerk of Court. (Campbell, Scott)
October 2, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by United States of America to Bobby Watkins (Hampton Avenue address) of Complaint for Civil Forfeiture of Property (Campbell, Scott)
October 2, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by United States of America to Bobby Watkins (41st Street address) of Complaint for Civil Forfeiture of Property (Campbell, Scott)
October 2, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by United States of America to Tasnique Love of Complaint for Civil Forfeiture of Property (Campbell, Scott)
October 2, 2019 Filing 2 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by United States of America. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Campbell, Scott)
October 2, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge William E Duffin ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website (jcl)
October 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Civil Forfeiture In Rem against Approximately $40238 US Currency by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Warrant for Arrest in Rem)(Campbell, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Approximately $40238 US Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $40238 US Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Scott J Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Tasnique Love
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?