Czapiewski v. Foster
Plaintiff: David Czapiewski
Defendant: Cathy Jess, Dr Gary Ankarlo, John Doe M.D., CO John Doe #2 and Brian Foster
Case Number: 2:2019cv01454
Filed: October 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Office: Milwaukee Office
Presiding Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2019 Filing 30 REQUEST by David Czapiewski for referral to Magistrate Judge for Mediation. (mac)
October 30, 2019 Filing 29 LETTER from David Czapiewski regarding delay in receipt of the #28 Scheduling Order. (tlf)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 10/22/2019: Amended Pleadings due by 12/20/2019; Motions to Dismiss due by 1/15/2020; Discovery to be completed by 4/30/2020; Interim Settlement Report due by 5/15/2020; Summary Judgment Motions due by 5/22/2020. Plaintiff to identify the John Doe defendant and amend his pleadings accordingly within 90 days or this case may be dismissed without further notice. Dates for trial, other relevant pretrial deadlines, and final settlement report to be set as necessary. See Order. (Attachments: #1 Rules and Guides) (cc: all counsel, via mail to David Czapiewski at Green Bay Correctional Institution)(jm)
October 21, 2019 Filing 27 LETTER from David Czapiewski inquiring as to screening/scheduling. (lh)
October 11, 2019 Filing 26 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by David Czapiewski. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (mac)
October 4, 2019 Filing 25 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Brian Foster. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bachhuber, Rachel)
October 3, 2019 Filing 24 LETTER from the clerk to Plaintiff re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge William E. Duffin and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. (ds)
October 3, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge J P Stadtmueller ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (ds)
October 3, 2019 Filing 23 Case transferred in from District of Wisconsin Western; Case Number 3:19-cv-00438. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER denying plaintiff David Czapiewski's motion to withdraw his response and for an extensionof time, dkt. #21 . Defendants Brian Foster and John Doe MD's motion to transfer this case to the Eastern District of Wisconsin, dkt. #18 , is GRANTED. This case is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 10/3/2019. (jef),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 10/3/2019.]
October 3, 2019 Filing 21 Motion to Withdraw Response and for Extension of Time to Respond to #18 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or Change Venue, by Plaintiff David Czapiewski. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - ICE Report Complaint Number WCI-2016-3156, #2 Cover Letter) (nln),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 10/3/2019.]
October 1, 2019 Filing 20 Plaintiff David Czapiewski's Response to Defendant's #18 Motion to Dismiss. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter) (nln),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 10/3/2019.]
September 30, 2019 Set Telephone Pretrial Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 11/13/2019 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Defendant responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Notice Regarding the Telephone Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (nln),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 10/3/2019.]
September 27, 2019 Filing 19 ANSWER by Defendant Brian Foster. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Remington, Jennifer),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 10/3/2019.]
September 25, 2019 Set Briefing Deadlines as to defendants' #18 MOTION TO DISMISS or Transfer Venue. Plaintiff's Brief in Opposition due 10/9/2019. Defendants' Brief in Reply due 10/16/2019. (jef),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 10/3/2019.]
September 25, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION TO DISMISS or Transfer Venue by Defendant Brian Foster. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Remington, Jennifer),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 10/3/2019.]
September 13, 2019 Filing 17 Second Motion for Assistance in Recruiting Counsel by Plaintiff David Czapiewski. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit F - Letter from Attorney Olejniczak dated 6/5/19, #2 Exhibit G - Letter from Attorney Esser dated 7/11/19, #3 Exhibit H - Disbursement Request, #4 Cover Letter) (nln),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 10/3/2019.]
September 3, 2019 Filing 16 Letter re #7 Order on Leave to Proceed by Plaintiff David Czapiewski. (rks),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 10/3/2019.]
August 30, 2019 Filing 15 Notice that for the remainder of this lawsuit, with respect to the defendant the Wisconsin Department of Justice has accepted service for, plaintiff need only send a copy of his filings in this case to the court pursuant to an informal service agreement with the Department. (jef),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 10/3/2019.]
August 30, 2019 Filing 14 Notice of Appearance filed by Rachel Lee Bachhuber for Defendant Brian Foster. (Bachhuber, Rachel),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 10/3/2019.]
August 30, 2019 Filing 13 Acceptance of Service by DOJ on behalf of Defendant Brian Foster. (Remington, Jennifer),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 10/3/2019.]
August 30, 2019 Filing 12 Notice of Appearance filed by Jennifer Renee Remington for Defendant Brian Foster. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Remington, Jennifer),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 10/3/2019.]
August 13, 2019 Filing 11 Letter to Judge Crabb from Plaintiff David Czapiewski dated 8/5/19 re #8 Motion for Assistance in Recruiting Counsel. (nln),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 10/3/2019.]
August 6, 2019 Filing 10 Letter to Judge Crabb from Plaintiff David Czapiewski re #8 Motion for Assistance in Recruiting Counsel. (nln),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 10/3/2019.]
August 1, 2019 Filing 9 Declaration of Victor Brown filed by Plaintiff David Czapiewski re: #8 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. (rks),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 10/3/2019.]
August 1, 2019 Filing 8 Motion for Appointment of Counsel by Plaintiff David Czapiewski. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-E - Psychiatric Documents, #2 Exhibits F-H - Letters from Andrus Intellectual Propoerty Law and Habush Habush and Rottier, and Disbursement Request, #3 Cover Letter) (rks),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 10/3/2019.]
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER on Leave to Proceed: Plaintiff granted leave to proceed against Defendant John Doe M.D. Leave to proceed denied and case dismissed against Cathy Jess, Gary Ankarlo and John Doe #2. Warden Brian Foster is added as a nominal defendant soley for the purposes of accomplishing service and conducting discovery regarding the identify of defendant John Doe M.D. Materials delivered to DOJ for acceptance of service. Signed by District Judge Barbara B. Crabb on 7/30/2019. (jef),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 10/3/2019.]
May 30, 2019 Filing 6 Notice from the Clerk regarding the Prisoner E-Filing Program. (Attachments: #1 Prisoner E-Filing Information Packet) (rks),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 10/3/2019.]
May 30, 2019 Filing 5 Warden PLRA Letter. (rks),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 10/3/2019.]
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER on ifp request: Complaint taken under advisement for screening. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 5/30/2019. (rks),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 10/3/2019.]
May 30, 2019 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Plaintiff David Czapiewski. (rks),(ps) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/30/2019: #1 IPP Calculation) (rks). [Transferred from wiwd on 10/3/2019.]
May 30, 2019 Filing 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff David Czapiewski. (Attachments: #1 Authorization for Release of Institutional Account Information and Payment of the Filing Fee) (rks),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 10/3/2019.]
May 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by David Czapiewski. (Case non-randomly assigned to District Judge Barbara B. Crabb.) (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter) (rks),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 10/3/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Czapiewski v. Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cathy Jess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr Gary Ankarlo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO John Doe #2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Foster
Represented By: Rachel L Bachhuber
Represented By: Jennifer Renee Remington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Czapiewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?