Conner v. Acelero Learning Wisconsin, Inc.
Plaintiff: Clearrissia M. Conner and Clearrissia M Conner
Defendant: Acelero Learning Wisconsin, Inc. and Acelero Learning Wisconsin Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv01487
Filed: October 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Lynn Adelman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2019 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE Statement by Acelero Learning Wisconsin Inc. (Erickson, Elizabeth)
October 22, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by John T Woodson on behalf of Acelero Learning Wisconsin Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: John T. Woodson (Woodson, John)
October 16, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth A Erickson on behalf of Acelero Learning Wisconsin Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Elizabeth A. Erickson (Erickson, Elizabeth)
October 15, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Acelero Learning Wisconsin Inc - Waiver sent on 10/11/2019. (McDonald, Shannon)
October 11, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Clearrissia M Conner. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (McDonald, Shannon)
October 11, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE by Clearrissia M Conner Certificate of Interest (McDonald, Shannon)
October 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Shannon D McDonald on behalf of Clearrissia M Conner. Attorney(s) appearing: Shannon D. McDonald (McDonald, Shannon)
October 10, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge Lynn Adelman ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (ds)
October 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against Acelero Learning Wisconsin, Inc. by Clearrissia M. Conner. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3245381) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kloth, Christopher) Modified on 10/11/2019 (jcl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Conner v. Acelero Learning Wisconsin, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clearrissia M. Conner
Represented By: Christopher M Kloth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clearrissia M Conner
Represented By: Christopher M Kloth
Represented By: Shannon D McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acelero Learning Wisconsin, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acelero Learning Wisconsin Inc
Represented By: John T Woodson
Represented By: Elizabeth A Erickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?