Orgodolbazar v. Leopold et al
Plaintiff: Tumendelger Orgodolbazar
Defendant: Kenneth T Cuccinelli, Kay F Leopold, Christopher Wray, William Barr and Kevin McAleenan
Case Number: 2:2019cv01544
Filed: October 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Nancy Joseph
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 08:1329
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph on 12/17/2019 granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant's response to the complaint is due by February 24, 2020. (cc: all counsel) (aw)
December 17, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint for Writ of Mandamus by All Defendants. (Warwick, Lisa)
November 5, 2019 Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. (ds)
November 5, 2019 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by All Defendants. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Warwick, Lisa)
November 5, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa T Warwick on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney(s) appearing: AUSA Lisa T. Warwick (Warwick, Lisa)
October 24, 2019 Summons Issued as to William Barr, Kenneth T Cuccinelli, Kay F Leopold, Kevin McAleenan, Christopher Wray. (blr)
October 23, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Tumendelger Orgodolbazar. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Straub, Erich)
October 23, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Tumendelger Orgodolbazar (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Straub, Erich)
October 23, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by Tumendelger Orgodolbazar. (Straub, Erich)
October 22, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (ds)
October 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Writ of Mandamus against All Defendants by Tumendelger Orgodolbazar. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3254951) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Straub, Erich)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Orgodolbazar v. Leopold et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth T Cuccinelli
Represented By: Lisa T Warwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kay F Leopold
Represented By: Lisa T Warwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Wray
Represented By: Lisa T Warwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Barr
Represented By: Lisa T Warwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin McAleenan
Represented By: Lisa T Warwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tumendelger Orgodolbazar
Represented By: Erich C Straub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?