Neevel v. Unum Life Insurance Company of America et al
Plaintiff: Kimberly D. Neevel and Kimberly D Neevel
Defendant: LifePoint Hospitals, Inc. Welfare Benefits Plan, Unum Life Insurance Company of America, LifePoint Corporate Services, General Partnership, LifePoint Hospitals Inc Welfare Benefits Plan and LifePoint Corporate Services General Partnership
Case Number: 2:2019cv01589
Filed: October 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William E Duffin
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2019 NOTICE from the clerk to Defendant Unum Life Insurance Company of America requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge William E. Duffin be filed within 7 days; the form is available at the court's web site: www.wied.uscourts.gov(mlm)
December 2, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kimberly D Neevel. LifePoint Hospitals Inc Welfare Benefits Plan served on 11/20/2019. (Covington, Brianna)
December 2, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kimberly D Neevel. LifePoint Corporate Services General Partnership served on 11/20/2019. (Covington, Brianna)
November 25, 2019 NOTICE from the clerk to Defendant Unum Life Insurance Company of America requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge William E. Duffin be filed within 21 days; the form is available at the court's web site: www.wied.uscourts.gov (mlm)
November 22, 2019 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE Statement by Unum Life Insurance Company of America. (Wagener, Terrance)
November 22, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Unum Life Insurance Company of America.(Wagener, Terrance)
November 6, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kimberly D Neevel. Unum Life Insurance Company of America served on 11/1/2019. (Covington, Brianna)
October 30, 2019 Summons Issued as to LifePoint Corporate Services General Partnership, LifePoint Hospitals Inc Welfare Benefits Plan, Unum Life Insurance Company of America. (mlm)
October 30, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Kimberly D. Neevel. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Covington, Brianna)
October 30, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge William E Duffin ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website (jcl)
October 29, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by Kimberly D. Neevel. (Covington, Brianna)
October 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Kimberly D. Neevel. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3262675) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Unum Life Insurance Company of America, #3 Summons LifePoint Corporate Services, General Partnership, #4 Summons LifePoint Hospitals, Inc. Welfare Benefits Plan)(Covington, Brianna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Neevel v. Unum Life Insurance Company of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LifePoint Hospitals, Inc. Welfare Benefits Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unum Life Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Terrance J Wagener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LifePoint Corporate Services, General Partnership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LifePoint Hospitals Inc Welfare Benefits Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LifePoint Corporate Services General Partnership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly D. Neevel
Represented By: Brianna M Covington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly D Neevel
Represented By: Brianna M Covington
Represented By: Alan C Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?