Shelton v. Department of Veterans Affairs
Plaintiff: Melvin Shelton
Defendant: Department of Veterans Affairs
Case Number: 2:2019cv01617
Filed: November 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William E Duffin
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2019 Filing 6 LETTER REQUESTING the court that case number 15cv003987 be dismissed by Melvin Shelton. (mlm)
December 30, 2019 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Melvin Shelton. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (mlm)
December 10, 2019 Filing 4 SECOND LETTER from the clerk to Plaintiff re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge William E. Duffin and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. (mlm)
November 6, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Melvin Shelton (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kah)
November 5, 2019 Filing 2 LETTER from the clerk to Melvin Shelton requesting the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge William E Duffin be filed within 21 days. Also requesting payment of the full filing fee or that a petition to proceed without prepayment of the full filing fee be filed within 21 days. (kah)
November 4, 2019 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT against Department of Veterans Affairs filed by Melvin Shelton. (kah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shelton v. Department of Veterans Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melvin Shelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Veterans Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?