Rasmusson v. Ozinga Redi Mix Concrete, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jennifer Rasmusson
Defendant: Ozinga Redi Mix Concrete Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv01625
Filed: November 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Lynn Adelman
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 12/2/19 that a telephonic Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) scheduling conference will be held on January 14, 2020 at 11:15 a.m. The court will initiate the call. The participation of the attorney who will be handling the case is required and their telephone number should be provided in the Rule 26(f) report. (cc: all counsel)(jad)
November 27, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Ozinga Redi Mix Concrete Inc.(Swinick, Corey)
November 26, 2019 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE Statement by Ozinga Redi Mix Concrete Inc. (Swinick, Corey)
November 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Corey J Swinick on behalf of Ozinga Redi Mix Concrete Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Corey J. Swinick (Swinick, Corey)
November 26, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by David J Hanus on behalf of Ozinga Redi Mix Concrete Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: David J. Hanus (Hanus, David)
November 5, 2019 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE Statement by Jennifer Rasmusson. (Olson, Alan)
November 5, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Jennifer Rasmusson. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Olson, Alan)
November 5, 2019 Summons Issued as to Ozinga Redi Mix Concrete, Inc. (jcl)
November 5, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge Lynn Adelman ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)
November 5, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Jennifer Rasmusson (Olson, Alan)
November 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against Ozinga Redi Mix Concrete, Inc. by Jennifer Rasmusson. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3268926) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Olson, Alan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rasmusson v. Ozinga Redi Mix Concrete, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ozinga Redi Mix Concrete Inc
Represented By: Corey J Swinick
Represented By: David J Hanus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Rasmusson
Represented By: Alan C Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?