Thornton et al v. Doe et al
Plaintiff: Sherrone Thornton and Myainda Dorene Henderson
Defendant: Jane Doe, John Doe and St Joseph Hospital
Case Number: 2:2019cv01643
Filed: November 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2019 INITIAL PARTIAL FILING FEE Received: $3.13, receipt number GB4689-5576; the payment of all future filing fees will be maintained by the financial department (lh)
December 2, 2019 Filing 9 Second MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Sherrone Thornton. (mac)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 11/21/2019. Myainda Dorene Henderson is STRICKEN as a plaintiff in this case. By 12/12/2019, Plaintiff Sherrone Thornton shall forward to the Clerk of Court the sum of $3.13 as an initial partial filing fee in this action. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Sherrone Thornton and Warden at Racine Correctional Institution)(jm)
November 14, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Sherrone Thornton. (tlf)
November 14, 2019 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Sherrone Thornton. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (tlf)
November 14, 2019 Filing 5 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Sherrone Thornton. (tlf)
November 12, 2019 Filing 4 LETTER from the Clerk to Sherrone Thornton regarding the Prisoner E-Filing Program. (cc: All Counsel) (Attachments: #1 Prisoner E-Filing Information Packet)(tlf)
November 8, 2019 Filing 3 LETTER from the clerk to Sherrone Thornton re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge Duffin and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. Also requesting that a six-month certified prisoner trust account statement be filed within 21 days. (lh)
November 8, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Sherrone Thornton. (lh)
November 8, 2019 Filing 1 PRISONER COMPLAINT (UNSIGNED by Plaintiff Sherrone Thornton) with Jury Demand filed against All Defendants by Sherrone Thornton, Myainda Dorene Henderson. (lh) Modified on 11/15/2019 (asc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thornton et al v. Doe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St Joseph Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherrone Thornton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Myainda Dorene Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?