Holtz v. Frostman
Plaintiff: Crystal L Holtz and Crystal Holtz
Defendant: Jack Rakowski, Josh Kaul, Unemployment Insurance and Caleb Frostman
Case Number: 2:2019cv01646
Filed: November 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12132
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2020 Filing 13 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #11 Notice of Appeal (dl)
January 6, 2020 Filing 12 Pro Se Cover Letter re: #11 Notice of Appeal (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet)(dl)
January 6, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #10 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee, by Crystal Holtz. (cc: all counsel) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(dl)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Judge J P Stadtmueller GRANTING #2 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that #4 Plaintiff's amended complaint is the operative pleading; that the ADA Claim in the amended complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice; defendants Kaul, Rakowski and Unemployment Insurance are DISMISSED; Caleb Frostman shall be substituted in as a Defendant; #8 answer filed by Kaul and Rakowski is STRICKEN; and within 14 days Plaintiff shall file a notice indicating which method of service she desires (cc: all counsel, pltf via first class mail) (vkb)
December 13, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE filed by Crystal Holtz re #8 Answer to Amended Complaint (asc)
December 5, 2019 Filing 8 STRICKEN Pursuant to #10 Order ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Josh Kaul, Jack Rakowski (Flugaur, Brandon) Modified on 12/18/2019 (vkb)
December 5, 2019 Filing 7 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE BY DOJ as to Josh Kaul, Jack Rakowski (Flugaur, Brandon)
December 5, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon T Flugaur on behalf of Josh Kaul, Jack Rakowski. Attorney(s) appearing: Brandon T. Flugaur (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Flugaur, Brandon)
November 18, 2019 Filing 5 INCOMPLETE Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Crystal Holtz. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Attachments: #1 Letter from Clerk's Office requesting complete Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form be filed within 21 days)(amb)
November 14, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Crystal Holtz.(asc)
November 8, 2019 Filing 3 LETTER from the clerk to plaintiff re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. (asc)
November 8, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Crystal L Holtz. (asc)
November 8, 2019 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Crystal L Holtz. (asc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holtz v. Frostman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Rakowski
Represented By: Brandon T Flugaur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Josh Kaul
Represented By: Brandon T Flugaur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unemployment Insurance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caleb Frostman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal L Holtz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal Holtz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?