Fowlkes v. Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Ladonesty Fowlkes
Defendant: Andrew Saul and Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2019cv01648
Filed: November 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William E Duffin
Referring Judge: Pamela Pepper
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric H Schepard on behalf of Commissioner of the Social Security Administration. Attorney(s) appearing: Eric Schepard (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Schepard, Eric)
December 6, 2019 Filing 10 Briefing Letter electronically transmitted to the parties: Plaintiff's brief due March 16, 2020; Defendant's response due April 27, 2020; Plaintiff's reply due May 12, 2020. (cc: all counsel, via US mail to Plaintiff) (blr)
December 6, 2019 Transmit #5 Amended Complaint and #7 Order via certified mail to the Commissioner of Social Security and the US Attorney General; US Attorney served electronically via CM/ECF. (blr)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE ON CONSENT signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 12/6/2019. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge William E. Duffin for all further proceedings. Chief Judge Pamela Pepper no longer assigned to case. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Ladonesty Fowlkes)(cb)
December 6, 2019 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Commissioner of the Social Security Administration. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Pawlak, Brian)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 12/6/2019 GRANTING #6 plaintiff's amended motion for leave to proceed without prepaying filing fee. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Ladonesty Fowlkes)(cb)
December 3, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Ladonesty Fowlkes. (blr)
December 3, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Administration filed by Ladonesty Fowlkes. (blr) (Supplement referenced was not included with filing) Modified on 12/4/2019 (blr). (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/6/2019: #1 Attachments A-F (originally filed at ECF 1-1) (blr).
November 19, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Ladonesty Fowlkes. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (blr)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 11/19/2019. By 12/20/2019, plaintiff to file amended complaint and request to proceed without prepaying filing fee, using EDWI standard forms. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Ladonesty Fowlkes-with blank forms)(cb)
November 8, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Ladonesty Fowlkes. (blr)
November 8, 2019 Filing 1 PRO SE SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Administration filed by Ladonesty Fowlkes. Consent forms distributed to the parties for Magistrate Judge William E. Duffin. (Attachments: #1 Attachments A-F)(blr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fowlkes v. Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ladonesty Fowlkes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Brian E Pawlak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Represented By: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Brian E Pawlak
Represented By: Eric H Schepard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?