Segura v. White Lodging Services Corporation
Plaintiff: Jodie Segura
Defendant: White Lodging Services Corporation
Case Number: 2:2019cv01671
Filed: November 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Pamela Pepper
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 12/30/2019. Rule 26(a) Disclosures to be exchanged by 2/7/2020; Amended Pleadings due by 2/7/2020; Plaintiff's Expert Witness List due by 4/17/2020; Defendant's Expert Witness List due by 6/10/2020; Discovery due by 7/17/2020; Dispositive Motions or Joint Status Report due by 8/21/2020, response and reply deadlines mandated by Civil L.R. 56 shall apply to dispositive motions. Any party filing proposed findings of fact shall email Word version of proposed findings to PepperPO@wied.uscourts.gov. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
December 27, 2019 Filing 7 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan by Jodie Segura. (McDonald, Shannon)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 12/6/2019. Rule 26 Discovery Plan due by 12/27/2019. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
December 5, 2019 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE Statement by White Lodging Services Corporation. (Dill, Jesse)
December 5, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and Statement of Defenses by White Lodging Services Corporation.(Dill, Jesse)
December 5, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jesse R Dill on behalf of White Lodging Services Corporation. Attorney(s) appearing: Jesse R. Dill (Dill, Jesse)
November 14, 2019 Summons Issued as to White Lodging Services Corporation. (amb)
November 13, 2019 Filing 2 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Jodie Segura. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (McDonald, Shannon)
November 13, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Chief Judge Pamela Pepper ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (ds)
November 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against White Lodging Services Corporation by Jodie Segura. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3276378) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(McDonald, Shannon) Modified on 11/14/2019 (amb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Segura v. White Lodging Services Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jodie Segura
Represented By: Shannon D McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: White Lodging Services Corporation
Represented By: Jesse R Dill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?