Gonzalez-Valencia v. Schmidt
Plaintiff: Miguel Gonzalez-Valencia
Defendant: Sheriff Dale J Schmidt
Case Number: 2:2019cv01686
Filed: November 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2019 Filing 7 Return of Service of Complaint by Certified Mail; US Attorney Office served on 11/29/2019. (mac)
November 22, 2019 Filing 6 Return of Service of Complaint by Certified Mail served upon Sheriff Dale Schmidt on 11/20/19 (lh)
November 21, 2019 Filing 5 JUDGMENT signed by Deputy Clerk and approved by Judge William C Griesbach on 11/21/2019. (cc: all counsel)(cav)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER dismissing #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Miguel Gonzalez-Valencia. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
November 20, 2019 Filing 3 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William C Griesbach: Telephone Conference held on 11/20/2019. (Tape #112019) (lh)
November 19, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing: (cc: all counsel) Telephone Conference set for 11/20/2019 10:00 AM in By Telephone before Judge William C Griesbach. The court will initiate the call. Counsel are to provide the telephone number at which they can be reached (direct dial preferred) prior to the telephone conference. In the event counsel are unavailable at the scheduled time of the telephone conference, the conference may be rescheduled and counsel may be required to appear in person. Please provide your telephone number to the Office of the Clerk at wied_clerks_gb@wied.uscourts.gov(cav)
November 18, 2019 Transmit Petition and Order via certified mail to the United States Attorney of this District, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Sheriff Dale Schmidt and United States Department of Justice. (cav)
November 18, 2019 Filing 2 SCREENING ORDER The Clerk of Court is directed to serve the petition and copy of this Order on Dale Schmidt,the Sheriff responsible for the Dodge Detention Center. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure4(i), the Clerk of Court is also directed to send a copy of the petition and this Order to the UnitedStates Attorney of this District, United States Department of Homeland Security, United StatesImmigration and Customs Enforcement, and United States Department of Justice. The Clerk ofCourt is further directed to place this matter on the courts schedule for a telephone conference. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
November 15, 2019 Case Opening Modification(s); The following modification(s) have been made to your case entry: One or more party names have been modified - please remember to follow the Party Name Guidelines found on our website. ; Please refer to the # attorney case opening instructions, party name guidelines found in the user manual for further guidance (cav)
November 14, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge William C Griesbach ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website (jcl)
November 14, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION (unsigned) for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Miguel Gonzalez-Valencia. ( Filing Fee PAID $5 receipt number BWIEDC-3278595) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Crouse, Benjamin) Modified as unsigned on 11/20/2019 (lh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gonzalez-Valencia v. Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguel Gonzalez-Valencia
Represented By: Benjamin M Crouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Dale J Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?