DeEnterprises Inc v. Viking Packaging Technologies Inc
Plaintiff: DeEnterprises Inc
Defendant: Viking Packaging Technologies Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv01715
Filed: November 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Nancy Joseph
Referring Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Judge J.P. Stadtmueller on 1/16/20. Interim Settlement Report due by 6/10/20; Dispositive Motions due by 6/15/20; Final Settlement Report due by 10/19/20; Motions in Limine and Daubert Motions due by 10/23/20; Final/Joint Pretrial Report due by 2:00 PM on 10/28/20. Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/3/20 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 425, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI before Judge J.P. Stadtmueller. Jury Trial set for 11/9/20 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 425, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI before Judge J.P. Stadtmueller. See Order. (cc: all counsel)(cl)
January 16, 2020 Filing 17 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge J.P. Stadtmueller: Scheduling Conference held on 1/16/2020. (Court Reporter John Schindhelm) (cl)
January 8, 2020 Filing 16 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan by DeEnterprises Inc. (Meece, Timothy)
January 7, 2020 Filing 15 DISCLOSURE Statement by Viking Packaging Technologies Inc. (Manion, Shauna)
January 7, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Viking Packaging Technologies Inc.(Manion, Shauna)
December 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 12/31/2019. #11 Parties' Stipulation for Extension of Time is ADOPTED; by 1/7/2020, Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to #1 Plaintiff's Complaint. #12 Parties' Stipulation for Partial Dismissal is ADOPTED; Counts 6-9 of #1 Plaintiff's Complaint are DISMISSED without prejudice. (cc: all counsel)(jm)
December 27, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION Between All Parties For Partial Dismissal Without Prejudice by Viking Packaging Technologies Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Manion, Shauna)
December 27, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION Between All Parties To Extend Defendant's Deadline to File Answer by Viking Packaging Technologies Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Manion, Shauna)
December 26, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 1/16/2020 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 425, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI before Judge J P Stadtmueller. Joint Rule 26 Plan due by 1/13/2020. (cc: all counsel)(jm)
December 17, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher J Galfano on behalf of DeEnterprises Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Christopher J. Galfano (Galfano, Christopher)
December 13, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by K Scott Wagner on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney(s) appearing: K. Scott Wagner (Wagner, K)
December 13, 2019 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Viking Packaging Technologies Inc. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Manion, Shauna)
December 13, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Shauna D Manion on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney(s) appearing: Shauna D. Manion (Manion, Shauna)
November 25, 2019 Case reassigned to Judge J P Stadtmueller. Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph no longer assigned to the case. (asc)
November 25, 2019 Summons Issued as to Viking Packaging Technologies Inc. (asc)
November 22, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by DeEnterprises Inc (Meece, Timothy)
November 22, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by DeEnterprises Inc. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Meece, Timothy)
November 21, 2019 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE Statement by DeEnterprises Inc. (Meece, Timothy)
November 21, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy C Meece on behalf of DeEnterprises Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Timothy C. Meece (Meece, Timothy)
November 21, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (ds)
November 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against Viking Packaging Technologies Inc by DeEnterprises Inc. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3285802) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Meece, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DeEnterprises Inc v. Viking Packaging Technologies Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DeEnterprises Inc
Represented By: Timothy C Meece
Represented By: Christopher J Galfano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viking Packaging Technologies Inc
Represented By: Shauna D Manion
Represented By: K Scott Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?