Sherman Creek Condominiums Inc v. Mid-Century Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Sherman Creek Condominiums Inc
Defendant: Mid-Century Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv01735
Filed: November 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Pamela Pepper
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2020 Filing 20 BRIEF in Opposition filed by Sherman Creek Condominiums Inc re #18 MOTION to Bifurcate and stay MOTION to Stay . (Mayer, John)
December 19, 2019 Filing 19 BRIEF in Support filed by Mid-Century Insurance Company re #18 MOTION to Bifurcate and stay . (Luell, Stacy)
December 19, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Bifurcate and stay by Mid-Century Insurance Company. (Luell, Stacy). Added MOTION to Stay on 12/20/2019 (amb).
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 12/17/2019. Rule 26(a) Disclosures to be exchanged by 12/24/2019; Amended Pleadings due by 1/31/2020; Plaintiff's Expert Witness List due by 3/2/2020; Defendant's Expert Witness List due by 6/2/2020; Discovery due by 8/3/2020; Dispositive Motions or Joint Status Report due by 9/3/2020, response and reply deadlines mandated by Civil L.R. 56 apply to dispositive motions. Any party filing proposed findings of fact shall email Word version of proposed findings to PepperPO@wied.uscourts.gov. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
December 16, 2019 Filing 16 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan by Mid-Century Insurance Company. (Luell, Stacy)
December 10, 2019 Filing 15 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Mid-Century Insurance Company. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Luell, Stacy)
December 4, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan R Graff on behalf of Sherman Creek Condominiums Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Ryan R. Graff (Graff, Ryan)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 12/3/2019. The court ORDERS that the parties shall file a joint status report by the end of the day on December 17, 2019 updating the court as to the status of this case and the parties' anticipated next steps. Note: there is no document associated with this text only order. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
November 27, 2019 Filing 12 Witness List by Sherman Creek Condominiums Inc. (Mayer, John)
November 27, 2019 Filing 11 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Sherman Creek Condominiums Inc. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Mayer, John)
November 27, 2019 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE Statement by Sherman Creek Condominiums Inc. (Mayer, John)
November 26, 2019 Filing 9 Case transferred in from District of Wisconsin Western; Case Number 3:19-cv-00897. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **Defendant has filed a motion to transfer this lawsuit to the Eastern District of Wisconsin, asserting that this would be more convenient for the parties, more convenient for the witnesses, and in the interests of justice. See dkt. #5 . All three assertions appear to be accurate, and plaintiff does not oppose the motion. See dkt. #7 . Therefore, it is ORDERED that defendant's motion to transfer is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to transfer this case to the U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 11/26/2019. (arw) [Transferred from wiwd on 11/26/2019.]
November 26, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Chief Judge Pamela Pepper ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website (jcl)
November 22, 2019 Filing 7 Response Stating No Opposition by Plaintiff Sherman Creek Condominiums, Inc. re: #5 Motion to Transfer, filed by Mid-Century Insurance Company. (Mayer, John) Modified on 11/22/2019. (lak) [Transferred from wiwd on 11/26/2019.]
November 4, 2019 Standard attachments for Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Order Regarding Assignment of Cases, #Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Consent/Request for Reassignment, #Order on Dispositive Motions. (arw) [Transferred from wiwd on 11/26/2019.]
November 4, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (arw) [Transferred from wiwd on 11/26/2019.]
November 1, 2019 Filing 6 Affidavit of Stacy K. Luell filed by Defendant Mid-Century Insurance Company re: #5 Motion to Transfer. (Luell, Stacy) Modified on 11/1/2019: Exhibit A is attached to the motion. (lak) [Transferred from wiwd on 11/26/2019.]
November 1, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION TO TRANSFER to Eastern District of Wisconsin by Defendant Mid-Century Insurance Company. Brief in Opposition due 11/22/2019. Brief in Reply due 12/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Amended Summons and Complaint) (Luell, Stacy) Modified on 11/1/2019. (lak) [Transferred from wiwd on 11/26/2019.]
October 31, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Mid-Century Insurance Company, case number 19-cv-2210. (lak) [Transferred from wiwd on 11/26/2019.]
October 31, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Dane County, case number 19cv2210 (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0758-2568860) filed by Mid-Century Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Amended Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Order for Dismissal, #4 Exhibit D - Mid-Century Answer to Amended Summons and Complaint, #5 Exhibit E - Mid-Century Disclosure Statement, #6 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet) (Luell, Stacy) Modified on 10/31/2019: Notice of Removal has state court case number. (lak) [Transferred from wiwd on 11/26/2019.]
October 31, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Stacy Kay Luell for Defendant Mid-Century Insurance Company. (Luell, Stacy) [Transferred from wiwd on 11/26/2019.]
October 31, 2019 Filing 1 Disregard. Refiled as #3 NOTICE OF REMOVAL. Modified on 10/31/2019. (lak) [Transferred from wiwd on 11/26/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sherman Creek Condominiums Inc v. Mid-Century Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherman Creek Condominiums Inc
Represented By: John F Mayer
Represented By: Sean A Bukowski
Represented By: Ryan R Graff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mid-Century Insurance Company
Represented By: Stacy K Luell
Represented By: Donald H Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?